Romero v. Vitro Flat Glass, LLC
Plaintiff: Aaron Romero
Defendant: Vitro Flat Glass, LLC
Case Number: 1:2020cv01573
Filed: November 6, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Labor: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 15, 2020. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER re STIPULATION TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. The Scheduling Conference currently set for 1/8/2021, is CONTINUED to 8/17/2021, at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report seven (7) days prior to the scheduling conference. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/14/2020. (Timken, A)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 STIPULATION To Continue Mandatory Scheduling Conference by Aaron Romero. Attorney Vecchi, Jill Marie added. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Vecchi, Jill)
November 17, 2020 Filing 5 ANSWER by Vitro Flat Glass, LLC.(McCandless, Sandra)
November 10, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVIE PLEADING. SEVEN DAY DEADLINE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/10/2020(Hernandez, M)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE TO PLAINTIFF OF REMOVAL OF ACTION TO FEDERAL COURT by Vitro Flat Glass, LLC re #1 Notice of Removal,. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Rassouli, Anna)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 1/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
November 6, 2020 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno, case number 20CECG02929 by Aaron Romero. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9230235) (Attachments: #1 Declaration Anna Youssefi, #2 Declaration C. Cuellar, #3 Declaration H. Chiang, #4 Civil Cover Sheet, #5 Notice Disclosure Statement)(McCandless, Sandra)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Romero v. Vitro Flat Glass, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vitro Flat Glass, LLC
Represented By: Sandra Ravich McCandless
Represented By: Anna Rassouli
Represented By: Anna Youssefi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron Romero
Represented By: Matthew Evan Crawford
Represented By: David Thomas Mara
Represented By: Jill Marie Vecchi
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?