Avalos v. Gonzalez et al
Plaintiff: George Avalos
Defendant: Manjeet K Grewal, Dev S Grewal, Pritam S Grewal and Felipe Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2020cv01578
Filed: November 9, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 8 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *Felipe Gonzalez* (Lundstrom, T)
December 11, 2020 Filing 7 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to Felipe Gonzalez by George Avalos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Re: Entry of Default)(Manning, Joseph)
November 13, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Felipe Gonzalez served on 11/13/2020, answer due 12/4/2020. (Manning, Joseph)
November 9, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/9/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
November 9, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Manjeet K Grewal, Pritam S Grewal* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph R. Manning, Jr.* *20062 SW Birch Street* *Suite 200* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Sant Agata, S)
November 9, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Felipe Gonzalez, Dev S Grewal* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph R. Manning, Jr.* *20062 SW Birch Street* *Suite 200* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Sant Agata, S)
November 9, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by George Avalos (Manning, Joseph)
November 9, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT George Avalos against All Defendants by George Avalos. Attorney Manning, Joseph R. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9231920) (Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalos v. Gonzalez et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Manjeet K Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dev S Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Pritam S Grewal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Felipe Gonzalez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Avalos
Represented By: Joseph R. Manning, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?