Avalos v. J & D Properties
Plaintiff: George Avalos
Defendant: J & D Properties
Case Number: 1:2020cv01604
Filed: November 12, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 14, 2020 Filing 7 CLERK'S ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to *J & D Properties* (Jessen, A)
December 14, 2020 Filing 6 REQUEST FOR ENTRY OF DEFAULT as to J & D Properties by George Avalos. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Re: Entry of Default)(Manning, Joseph)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: J & D Properties served on 11/20/2020, answer due 12/11/2020. (Manning, Joseph)
November 13, 2020 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/18/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
November 13, 2020 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *J & D Properties* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph R. Manning, Jr.* *Manning Law, APC* *20062 SW Birch Street, Suite 200* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 12, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by George Avalos (Manning, Joseph)
November 12, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT George Avalos against All Defendants by George Avalos. Attorney Manning, Joseph R. added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9237949) (Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalos v. J & D Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: J & D Properties
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Avalos
Represented By: Joseph R. Manning, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?