(PC) Williams v. Castro et al
Case Number: 1:2020cv01617
Filed: November 16, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights

Available Case Documents

The following documents for this case are available for you to view or download:

Date Filed Document Text
January 27, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 68 AMENDED ORDER & WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Transport Robert Curtis Williams, III, Inmate #X-4416799 to the US District Courthouse in Fresno for a Motions in Limine Hearing on February 8, 2023 at 10:00 a.m., signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 01/27/2023.(Flores, E)
January 20, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 66 ORDER Continuing Pretrial Conference Hearing signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/20/2023. Pretrial Conference set for 1/27/2023 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Lawrence, A)
January 9, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 58 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's Second 54 Motion to Appoint Counsel signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/9/2023. (Sant Agata, S)
January 3, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 56 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Motion Filed on December 22, 2022 on or Before January 7, 2023, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/3/2023. (Marrujo, C)
November 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 51 ORDER DENYING 50 Plaintiff's Motion to Appoint Counsel and Sua Sponte Granting Extension of Time to File Motions for Attendance of Witnesses signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/21/2022. Motion for Attendance of Incarcerated Witnesses due by 12/28/2022. (Lawrence, A)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 49 TRIAL SCHEDULING ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 08/30/2022. ( Jury Trial set for 2/21/2023 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, Telephonic Motion In Limine Hearing set for 2/8/2023 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone, Telephonic Pretrial Hearing set for 1/20/2023 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone)(Martin-Gill, S)
August 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 47 ORDER GRANTING Defendants' Second Motion to modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order 46 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/4/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
May 20, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 44 ORDER DIRECTING Defendants to File a Response to Plaintiff's Notice to Proceed With the Expedited Trial Setting Procedures Within Ten Days, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/20/2022. (Marrujo, C)
March 17, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 ORDER APPROVING 40 Parties Stipulation to Modify the Discovery and Scheduling Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/17/2022. Parties may conduct discovery until, and file any motion to compel discovery by, May 25, 2022; all pretrial motions, except motions to compel discovery, shall be filed on or before August 5, 2022. All other remaining terms set forth in the discovery and scheduling order remain in full force and effect. (Rivera, O)
January 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER reassigning matter to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 1/5/2022. New Case No. 1:20-cv-01617-SAP-(PC). (Lundstrom, T)
July 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 ORDER & WRIT OF HABEAS CORPUS AD TESTIFICANDUM to Produce Inmate Robert Curtis Williams, CDCR #AZ-8444 via Video Conference on August 5, 2021 at 9:30am before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 07/13/2021. (Maldonado, C)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER Setting Remote Settlement Conference and Staying Case for 65 Days signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/04/2021. Settlement Conference set for 8/5/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Flores, E)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ORDER ADOPTING 17 Findings and Recommendations; ORDERED that this action shall proceed on plaintiffs deliberate indifference claim against defendantRegado for making death threats, and against defendants Regado, Ruiz, and Castro for deliberate indi fference to his safety and violation of the Equal Protection Clause, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 03/7/2021. (Ruiz added. Case (Correctional Sergeant at CSP-Corcoran) and Luiz (Correctional Officer at CSP-Corcoran) terminated) (Martin-Gill, S)
February 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that this action proceed on Plaintiffs deliberate indifference claim against Defendant Regado for making death threats, and against Defendants Regado, Ruiz, and Castro for deliberate indifference to his safety and violation of the Equal Protection Clause; referred to Judge Unassigned DJ, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/1/2021. (Objections to F&R due within 14-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
December 9, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING 11 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to File an Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/9/2020. (Jessen, A)
November 16, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER of INTRADISTRICT TRANSFER from Sacramento (2:20-cv-2222 AC PC) to Fresno (1:20-cv-1617 SAB PC) signed by Magistrate Judge Allison Claire on 11/16/2020; this court has not ruled on plaintiff's request to proceed ifp. (Yin, K)
Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Williams v. Castro et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?