(PC) Coria v. Garcia et al
Plaintiff: Fernando Coria, Jr.
Defendant: M. Garcia, Thomas Navarro, Jeffrey Gallaway and Sergio Avila-Becerra
Case Number: 1:2020cv01652
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 12, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MOTION/Call for Injunctive Relief From Harassment by Fernando Coria, Jr. (Jessen, A)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 & #11 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/15/2020. (Attachments: #1 121120 IFP Application, #2 121420 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
December 15, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Fernando Coria Jr. (Rivera, O)
December 14, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Fernando Coria, Jr. (Rivera, O)
December 11, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Fernando Coria, Jr. (Lundstrom, T)
December 7, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to Either: (1) Submit New, Completed Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis; or (2) Pay $400.00 Filing Fee in Full; ORDER for Clerk to Send Plaintiff an Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/1/2020. Application or Filing Fee due within twenty (20) days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application) (Rivera, O)
December 2, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #8 Order served on Fernando Coria Jr. (Rivera, O)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER DENYING #5 Motion for Appointment of Counsel, signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 12/1/2020. (Rivera, O)
December 1, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on Fernando Coria Jr. (Rivera, O)
November 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by Fernando Coria, Jr. (Rivera, O)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by Fernando Coria, Jr. (Maldonado, C)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 12/24/2020. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CLERKS NOTICE: The Clerk of Court is in receipt of a Motion to Proceed in Forma Pauperis. The California Department of Corrections and Rehabilitation is DIRECTED to submit a Certified Prison Trust account statement for Fernando Coria, Jr, CDC AM-0814 to the Clerks Office within 72 business hours of this notification. The Prison Trust Account statement must reflect the activity for the last six months. Please email the certified prison trust account statement in pdf format to FilingsFresno@caed.uscourts.gov with the case number in the subject line as reflected on this notification. (Maldonado, C)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Fernando Coria, Jr. (Maldonado, C)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Sergio Avila-Becerra, Jeffrey Gallaway, M. Garcia, Thomas Navarro by Fernando Coria, Jr.(Maldonado, C)
November 20, 2020 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Fernando Coria Jr.. (Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Coria v. Garcia et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thomas Navarro
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Gallaway
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sergio Avila-Becerra
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Fernando Coria, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?