Sun Valley Farms, LLC v. Western Veg Produce, Inc.
Plaintiff: Sun Valley Farms, LLC
Defendant: Western Veg Produce, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2020cv01665
Filed: November 20, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 07 U.S.C. ยง 499
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 15, 2021 Filing 12 DECLARATION of June Monroe in support of #8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Monroe, June)
January 15, 2021 Filing 11 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Western Veg Produce, Inc. in re #10 Reply to Response to Motion. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Erwin Bartel Declaration, #2 Exhibit B - "About Us", #3 Exhibit C - Sun Valley Terminated PACA License, #4 Exhibit D - Blank PACA Application, #5 Exhibit E - BlueBook Report, #6 Exhibit F - Formal Complaint)(Monroe, June)
January 15, 2021 Filing 10 REPLY by Western Veg Produce, Inc. to RESPONSE to #8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Monroe, June)
January 11, 2021 Filing 9 OPPOSITION by Sun Valley Farms, LLC to #8 Motion to Dismiss,. (Rumph, Randall)
December 16, 2020 Filing 8 MOTION to DISMISS by Western Veg Produce, Inc.. Attorney Monroe, June T. added. Motion Hearing set for 1/25/2021 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum in Support of Respondent-Appellee's Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration of June Monroe In Support of Motion to Dismiss, #3 Proposed Order re Dismissal of Appeal)(Monroe, June)
December 9, 2020 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Western Veg Produce, Inc. served on 12/4/2020, answer due 12/28/2020. (Rumph, Randall)
December 9, 2020 Filing 6 PACA Administrative Documents and Decision and Order by Secretary of Agriculture. (Hall, S)
November 23, 2020 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 2/22/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
November 23, 2020 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Western Veg Produce, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Randall Martin Rumph* *Law Office of Randy Rumph* *218 H Street* *Bakersfield, CA 93304*. (Lundstrom, T)
November 23, 2020 Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Sun Valley Farms, LLC (Rumph, Randall)
November 23, 2020 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE: Attn:Randall Martin Rumph ***Civil Cover Sheet***Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Martin-Gill, S)
November 20, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western Veg Produce, Inc. by Sun Valley Farms, LLC. Attorney Rumph, Randall Martin added. (Filing fee $ 400, receipt number 0972-9259553) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit One)(Rumph, Randall)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sun Valley Farms, LLC v. Western Veg Produce, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sun Valley Farms, LLC
Represented By: Randall Martin Rumph
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western Veg Produce, Inc.
Represented By: June T. Monroe
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?