(PC) Bierman v. Kern County Sheriff Detention Facility Medical Administration
Plaintiff: James Bierman
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff Detention Facility Medical Administration
Case Number: 1:2020cv01777
Filed: December 17, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 12, 2021 Filing 11 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Bierman. (Maldonado, C)
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by James Bierman (Martin-Gill, S)
February 4, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Bierman. (Martin-Gill, S)
February 3, 2021 Filing 9 LETTER re Trust Account Statement, from James Bierman (Martin-Gill, S)
January 21, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion for Extension, served on James Bierman. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #5 Motion for Extension,signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 1/20/2021. (Motion for IFP or $402.00 Filing Fee due within 21-Day Deadline) (Martin-Gill, S) (Additional attachment(s) added on 1/21/2021: #1 IFP Application) (Martin-Gill, S).
January 15, 2021 Filing 5 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME by James Bierman. (Lundstrom, T)
December 30, 2020 Filing 6 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Martin-Gill, S)
December 22, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order served on James Bierman. (Lundstrom, T)
December 22, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and directing Plaintiff to re-file proper Application or pay filing fee within 30-Days signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 12/22/2020. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
December 18, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on James Bierman. (Maldonado, C)
December 18, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 1/22/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
December 17, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Bierman. (Maldonado, C)
December 17, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kern County Sheriff Detention Facility Medical Administration by James Bierman.(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Bierman v. Kern County Sheriff Detention Facility Medical Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff Detention Facility Medical Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?