Hayes v. Rojas et al
Plaintiff: Charles Hayes
Defendant: Deputy Patrick Gilbert Klawitter, Brandy Hirrel, Deputy Rhonda Powell Boyles, Jocelyn Marie, Deputy Mario Rojas, Connie Jefferies, Deputy Christopher Banks, Patrick Gilbert Klawitter, Rhonda Powell Boyles, Christopher Banks and Mario Rojas
Case Number: 1:2020cv01820
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 5, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 10 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS to Dismiss the Action for Claim Splitting, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 2/4/2021. Referred to District Judge. Objections to F&R due within 21 days. (Hall, S)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 RESPONSE to #8 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Charles Hayes. (Carr, Peter)
December 30, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE WHY THE ACTION SHOULD NOT BE DISMISSED FOR CLAIM SPLITTING. Plaintiff is ORDERED to show cause in writing, on or before January 12, 2021, why Hayes II should not be dismissed as claim splitting and an end run around this Court's denial of leave to amend. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 12/30/2020. (Apodaca, P)
December 29, 2020 Filing 7 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 3/23/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Jessen, A)
December 29, 2020 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Patrick Gilbert Klawitter, Jocelyn Marie, Mario Rojas* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nashaun Lamar Neal* *PLC Law Group, APC* *3756 Santa Rosalia Dr., Suite 326* *Los Angeles, CA 90008*. (Jessen, A)
December 29, 2020 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Christopher Banks, Rhonda Powell Boyles, Brandy Hirrel, Connie Jefferies* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Nashaun Lamar Neal* *PLC Law Group, APC* *3756 Santa Rosalia Dr., Suite 326* *Los Angeles, CA 90008*. (Jessen, A)
December 28, 2020 Filing 4 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:19- cv-01722-JLT, 2:20-cv-02048 by Charles Hayes. (Neal, Nashaun)
December 28, 2020 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Charles Hayes. (Neal, Nashaun)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Charles Hayes (Neal, Nashaun)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Charles Hayes. Attorney Neal, Nashaun Lamar added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9326419) (Neal, Nashaun)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Hayes v. Rojas et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Patrick Gilbert Klawitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brandy Hirrel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Rhonda Powell Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jocelyn Marie
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Mario Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Connie Jefferies
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deputy Christopher Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Gilbert Klawitter
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rhonda Powell Boyles
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Christopher Banks
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mario Rojas
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Hayes
Represented By: Nashaun Lamar Neal
Represented By: Peter Laurence Carr, IV
Represented By: Na'Shaun L. Neal
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?