(PC) Edwards v. Smith
Plaintiff: Charles Edwards
Defendant: D. Smith
Case Number: 1:2020cv01822
Filed: December 28, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Gary S Austin
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Jessen, A)
January 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Gary S. Austin on 01/07/21. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Maldonado, C)
January 7, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Charles Edwards. (Maldonado, C)
December 29, 2020 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 2/1/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
December 29, 2020 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Charles Edwards. (Maldonado, C)
December 28, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Charles Edwards. (Maldonado, C)
December 28, 2020 Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against D. Smith by Charles Edwards.(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Edwards v. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: D. Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charles Edwards
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?