(HC) Dilbert v. Fisher
Petitioner: Clifford Alan Dilbert
Respondent: R. Fisher
Case Number: 1:2020cv01835
Filed: December 30, 2020
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Habeas Corpus (General)
Cause of Action: 28:2254
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 25, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to Valley State Prison, P.O. Box 92, Chowchilla, CA 93610 by Clifford Alan Dilbert. Address current. (Jessen, A)
January 21, 2021 Filing 11 OBJECTIONS to #8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS by Petitioner Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Sant Agata, S)
January 12, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS, (Address Current), by Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Rivera, O)
January 12, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Rivera, O)
January 11, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #8 Findings and Recommendation served on Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Rivera, O)
January 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Assign District Judge; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATION to Dismiss #1 Habeas Petition, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/10/2021. Referred to Unassigned DJ; Objections to F&R due within 30 days. (Rivera, O)
January 11, 2021 Filing 7 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The new case number is: 1:20-cv-01835-NONE-JLT (HC). (Rivera, O)
January 5, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order Authorizing IFP Status served on Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Maldonado, C)
January 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER AUTHORIZING IN FORMA PAUPERIS STATUS as to Clifford Dilbert signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/05/21. (Maldonado, C)
January 5, 2021 Filing 5 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis. Please disregard docket entry as it was docketed in error. (Maldonado, C)
January 4, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider, #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Maldonado, C)
January 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 *** DISREGARD *** ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 01/04/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Motion) (Maldonado, C)
January 4, 2021 Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Petitioner's Consent or Decline due by 2/8/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
December 30, 2020 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Clifford Alan Dilbert. (Maldonado, C)
December 30, 2020 Filing 1 (2254) PETITION for WRIT of HABEAS CORPUS against R. Fisher by Clifford Alan Dilbert.(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (HC) Dilbert v. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Petitioner: Clifford Alan Dilbert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Respondent: R. Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?