(PC) James Bierman v. Youngblood et al
Plaintiff: James Bierman
Defendant: Donny Youngblood, Kern County Sheriff Office Chief Medical and Kern County Sheriff Office Administration
Case Number: 1:2021cv00060
Filed: January 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42:1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 5, 2021 Filing 6 PRISONER TRUST FUND ACCOUNT STATEMENT by James Bierman (Martin-Gill, S)
February 4, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James Bierman. (Rivera, O)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 LETTER re Trust Account Statement, from James Bierman (Martin-Gill, S)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Sant Agata, S)
January 21, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Complaint, #2 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on James Bierman. (Martin-Gill, S)
January 21, 2021 Filing 2 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 2/25/2021 (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
January 15, 2021 Filing 1 PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against Kern County Sheriff Office Administration, Kern County Sheriff Office Chief Medical, Donny Youngblood by James Bierman.(Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) James Bierman v. Youngblood et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Donny Youngblood
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff Office Chief Medical
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Kern County Sheriff Office Administration
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James Bierman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?