Vaden Anderson v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Vaden Anderson
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc., Daniel Buchino, Missy Brost, Jasbir Gurm, Ben Gregory, Golden State FC, LLC, Adam Petrini, Deanna Flores Zellous, Tyler Lindstrom, Juan Ramirez, Amazon.com, LLC and Matthew Akers
Case Number: 1:2021cv00127
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Jobs
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 25, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): On August 24, 2021, Plaintiff filed a notice of voluntary dismissal of this action, without prejudice, pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41(a). (Doc. #15 .) In the light of Plaintiff's voluntary dismissal, this action is terminated by operation of law without further order from the Court. Fed. R. Civ. P. 41(a)(1)(A)(i). This Court VACATES all pending dates and matters. The Clerk of the Court is directed to assign a district judge for the purpose of closing this case and then to CLOSE THIS CASE. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 8/25/2021. (Valdez, E)
August 25, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 16 Minute Order, served on Vaden Anderson. (Valdez, E)
August 24, 2021 Filing 15 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL pursuant to FRCP 41(a)(1)(A)(ii) by Vaden Anderson. (Martin-Gill, S)
July 21, 2021 Filing 14 SEALED EVENT. (Flores, E)
July 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #8 Request and Motion for Hippa Medical Information and California Highway Patrol Accident Report to be Filed under Seal signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/21/2021. (Flores, E)
July 21, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #13 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief served on Vaden Anderson. (Flores, E)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER GRANTING #10 Plaintiff's Request and Motion for Second Extension of Time to Hand File Amended Factual Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/20/2021. First Amended Complaint due by 8/23/2021. (Maldonado, C)
July 20, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #12 Order served on Vaden Anderson. (Maldonado, C)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER DENYING Plaintiff's #9 Request and Motion for Electronic Case Management Credentials Privileges and Pacer Access signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/19/2021. (Flores, E)
July 19, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief served on Vaden Anderson. (Flores, E)
July 16, 2021 Filing 10 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to Hand File Amended Factual Complaint by Vaden Anderson. (Flores, E)
July 15, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION for Electronic Case Management Credentials Privileges and Pacer Access by Vaden Anderson. (Flores, E)
July 15, 2021 Filing 8 MOTION for HIPPA Medical Information and California Highway Patrol Accident Report to be Filed Under Seal. (Martin-Gill, S)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Motion for Extension of time to file amended complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/18/2021. Amended Complaint due within 30-Days. (Lundstrom, T)
June 21, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Order on Motion for Extension served on Vaden Anderson. (Lundstrom, T)
June 16, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION for EXTENSION OF TIME to file amended complaint by Vaden Anderson. (Lundstrom, T)
May 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCREENING ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff Leave to File an Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/18/2021. ( First Amended Complaint due within 30-Day Deadline) (Attachments: #1 Amended PC Complaint Form)(Martin-Gill, S)
May 18, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on Vaden Anderson. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER GRANTING Plaintiff's #3 Motion to Proceed IFP, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 03/2/2021. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 3, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order on Motion to Proceed in forma pauperis served on Vaden Anderson. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 1, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)
February 16, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
February 1, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required.(text only) (Martin-Gill, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Vaden Anderson v. Amazon.Com, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.Com, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Daniel Buchino
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Missy Brost
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jasbir Gurm
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ben Gregory
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Golden State FC, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Adam Petrini
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Deanna Flores Zellous
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Tyler Lindstrom
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Juan Ramirez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon.com, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Matthew Akers
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Vaden Anderson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?