Foltz v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Plaintiff: Jamie Lynn Foltz
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Case Number: 1:2021cv00131
Filed: January 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
2 Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28:1441
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 13 OPPOSITION by GEICO Indemnity Company to #9 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of James Shew in Opposition to Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration of Jeffrey V. Commisso in Opposition to Motion to Remand)(Commisso, Jeffrey)
March 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 ORDER RE STIPULATED REQUEST TO CONTINUE SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/22/2021. The scheduling conference set for April 27, 2021, is CONTINUED to September 14, 2021, at 11:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9; The parties shall file a joint scheduling report seven (7) days prior to the scheduling conference; and If the motion to remand is denied and this matter is ripe for scheduling prior to the continued date, the parties may request that the scheduling conference be advanced.(Hernandez, M)
March 22, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Continuance of Joint Scheduling Conference by Jamie Lynn Foltz. (Wilkins, James)
February 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 2/24/2021: (Text Only Entry) Pursuant to the court's standing order, the hearing on the pending #9 motion to remand currently set on March 23, 2021 is hereby reset to April 6, 2021, which shall govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). The parties are further advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. (Thorp, J)
February 23, 2021 Filing 9 MOTION to REMAND by Jamie Lynn Foltz. Motion Hearing set for 3/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities in support of motion to remand, #2 Declaration in support of motion to remand)(Wilkins, James)
February 11, 2021 Filing 8 (Per chambers request) CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/27/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
February 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 2/10/2021: (Text Only Entry). Due to the Order of Recusal the Scheduling Conference is reset for 4/27/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference Report is due one week before the new conference date. (Hernandez, M)
February 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER of RECUSAL, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/8/2021. New Case Number: 1:21-cv-00131-DAD-SAB.(Marrujo, C)
February 3, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of ERRATA by GEICO Indemnity Company re #1 Notice of Removal,,,,.. (Commisso, Jeffrey)
February 1, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 4/20/2021 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
January 29, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Commisso, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by GEICO Indemnity Company (Commisso, Jeffrey)
January 29, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno Superior Court, case number 20CECG01625 by GEICO Indemnity Company. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9389710) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Jeffrey V. Commisso, #2 Exhibit A - Summons and Complaint and Service of Process Transmittal, #3 Exhibit B - Proof of Service of Summons and Complaint, #4 Exhibit C - GEICO Answer to Complaint, #5 Exhibit D - Foltz Supplemental Response to GEICO Special Interrogatories (Set 1), #6 Exhibit E - Foltz Supplemental Response to GEICO Request for Production (Set 1), #7 Exhibit F - Foltz Response to GEICO Form Interrogatories (Set 1), #8 Exhibit G - Foltz Insurance Policy, #9 Exhibit H - Westlaw Verdict and Settlement Summary for White v. GEICO Indemnity Company, Case No. BC471221 (Cal. Super. Ct.), #10 Exhibit I - Judgment on Special Verdict in White v. GEICO Indemnity Company, #11 Exhibit J - Notice of Entry of Judgment in Martinez v. Mercury Insurance Company, Case No. BC511701 (Cal. Super. Ct.), #12 Exhibit K - Declaration of James Shew in Support of GEICOs Opposition to Plaintiffs Motion to Compel, #13 Exhibit L - Other Pleadings and Filings from the Underlying Action, #14 Proof of Service)(Commisso, Jeffrey)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Foltz v. GEICO Indemnity Company
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jamie Lynn Foltz
Represented By: Alyson Berg
Represented By: James Hugh Wilkins
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: GEICO Indemnity Company
Represented By: Jared Kyle LeBeau
Represented By: John Tinley Brooks
Represented By: Jeffrey Vincent Commisso
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?