(SS) Blalock v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Rodney Nowell Blalock
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00144
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on March 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 3/18/2021: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:21-cv-00144-EPG-(SS).(Lundstrom, T)
March 17, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Coder, Ellinor)
March 9, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Rodney Nowell Blalock. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/26/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (Maldonado, C)
February 24, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
February 24, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Rodney Nowell Blalock pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/19/2021: The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, attached hereto, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, 6, 10. This stay does not prevent, and Plaintiff is directed to proceed with, service of process. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL. Consent or Decline due by 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
February 18, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Lundstrom, T)
February 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 USM Instructions). (Lundstrom, T)
February 17, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Rodney Nowell Blalock. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Rodney Nowell Blalock. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Blalock v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Ellinor Ravenel Coder
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rodney Nowell Blalock
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?