Velasquez v. Sun-Maid Growers of California
Plaintiff: Victor Velasquez
Defendant: Sun-Maid Growers of California
Case Number: 1:2021cv00194
Filed: February 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/16/2021: Pursuant to the Scheduling Conference held on 6/2/2021 before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean, the Court ordered Plaintiff's merits' discovery and class certification discovery open and set the following briefing schedule: Motion for Class Certification to be filed by 6/3/2022; Defendant's opposition due by 7/8/2022; and Plaintiff's reply due by 7/22/2022. A Mid-Discovery Status Conference is set for 12/8/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean, with a joint status report to be filed one full week prior to the conference and a copy of same, in Word format, emailed to epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov, for the Judge's review. The parties may participate telephonically by using the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
June 2, 2021 Filing 16 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 6/2/2021 with an order to follow. Plaintiff's Counsel Ruchira Mukherjee telephonically present. Defendant's Counsel Molly Kaban telephonically present. (Rooney, M)
May 26, 2021 Filing 15 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Sun-Maid Growers of California. (Kaban, Molly)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 5/4/2021: To accommodate the Court's calendar, the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 5/27/2021 is CONTINUED and will now be held on 6/2/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The Court grants telephonic appearances, with each party directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. The parties are also reminded to file a joint scheduling report one full week prior to the conference and email a copy of same, in Word format, to epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov, for the Judge's review. (Text Entry Only)(Rooney, M)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Sun-Maid Growers of California. (Kaban, Molly)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 ANSWER by Sun-Maid Growers of California.(Kaban, Molly)
April 26, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Adrianna C. Kourafas on behalf of Sun-Maid Growers of California. Attorney Kourafas, Adrianna C. added. (Kourafas, Adrianna)
April 19, 2021 Filing 10 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, for Extension of Time to Respond by Sun-Maid Growers of California. Attorney Kaban, Molly L. added. (Kaban, Molly)
April 5, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Sun-Maid Growers of California served on 3/30/2021, answer due 4/20/2021. (Ehmann, Ricardo)
February 17, 2021 Filing 8 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
February 17, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Sun-Maid Growers of California* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ricardo Ehmann* *Blumenthal Nordrehaug Bhowmik De Blouw LLP* *2255 Calle Clara* *La Jolla, CA 92037*. (Maldonado, C)
February 16, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Norman Blumenthal on behalf of Victor Velasquez. Attorney Blumenthal, Norman added. (Blumenthal, Norman)
February 16, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Aparajit Bhowmik on behalf of Victor Velasquez. Attorney Bhowmik, Aparajit added. (Bhowmik, Aparajit)
February 16, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Charlotte Elise James on behalf of Victor Velasquez. Attorney James, Charlotte Elise added. (James, Charlotte)
February 16, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Victoria Bree Rivapalacio on behalf of Victor Velasquez. Attorney Rivapalacio, Victoria Bree added. (Rivapalacio, Victoria)
February 16, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ruchira Piya Mukherjee on behalf of Victor Velasquez. Attorney Mukherjee, Ruchira Piya added. (Mukherjee, Ruchira)
February 15, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT /Class Action Complaint against Sun-Maid Growers of California by Victor Velasquez. Attorney Ehmann, Ricardo Ramon added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9416665) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Ehmann, Ricardo)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Velasquez v. Sun-Maid Growers of California
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Victor Velasquez
Represented By: Victoria Bree Rivapalacio
Represented By: Ruchira Piya Mukherjee
Represented By: Aparajit Bhowmik
Represented By: Norman Blumenthal
Represented By: Charlotte Elise James
Represented By: Ricardo Ramon Ehmann
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Sun-Maid Growers of California
Represented By: Adrianna C. Kourafas
Represented By: Molly L. Kaban
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?