Swain v. Anders Group, LLC
Plaintiff: Lisa Swain
Defendant: Anders Group, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00197
Filed: February 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 201
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 13, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER by Anders Group, LLC.(Engstrom, Casey)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/4/2021. Motion for Class Certification Hearing set for 3/23/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. Further Scheduling Conference set for 7/7/2022 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Kusamura, W)
May 4, 2021 Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lisa Swain.(Hayes, Matthew)
May 4, 2021 Filing 12 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held telephonically before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/4/2021. Scheduling Order to follow. Plaintiffs Counsel Kye Pawlenko present. Defendants Counsel Jeff Ranen present. (Kusamura, W)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/30/2021: (Text Only Entry) MINUTE ORDER ***TEXT ENTRY ONLY*** The parties are GRANTED permission to appear telephonically for the upcoming Scheduling Conference set on 5/4/2021 before Judge Oberto by dialing 888-557-8511 (access code 6208204), at the time of the hearing. You shall email Courtroom Deputy Wendy Kusamura, at WKusamura@caed.uscourts.gov, to advise the court who will be appearing telephonically. Minute Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/30/2021. (Kusamura, W)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Lisa Swain. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Proposed First Amended Complaint)(Hayes, Matthew)
March 25, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER by Anders Group, LLC.(Engstrom, Casey)
March 23, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF ASSOCIATION OF COUNSEL by Anders Group, LLC. Attorney Engstrom, Casey Nicole added. (Engstrom, Casey)
March 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY Jeffrey Scott Ranen for Anders Group, LLC in place of attorney Richard John Morin, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 03/18/2021. (Martin-Gill, S)
March 17, 2021 Filing 6 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Anders Group, LLC. (Engstrom, Casey)
March 3, 2021 Filing 5 STIPULATION to Extend Time for Anders Group, LLC to File Responsive Pleading by Anders Group, LLC. Attorney Morin, Richard John added. (Morin, Richard)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Anders Group, LLC served on 2/18/2021, answer due 3/11/2021. (Hayes, Matthew)
February 17, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
February 17, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Anders Group, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew B. Hayes* *Hayes Pawlenko LLP* *1414 Fair Oaks Ave., Unit 2B* *South Pasadena, CA 91030*. (Maldonado, C)
February 16, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Lisa Swain. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9417369) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Hayes, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Swain v. Anders Group, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lisa Swain
Represented By: Kye Douglas Pawlenko
Represented By: Matthew Bryan Hayes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Anders Group, LLC
Represented By: Casey Nicole Engstrom
Represented By: Richard John Morin
Represented By: Jeffrey Scott Ranen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?