(SS) Bissmeyer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Debbie G. Bissmeyer
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00209
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 30, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, paragraphs 6, 10. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/9/2021. CASE STAYED. (Valdez, E)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Debbie G. Bissmeyer. Commissioner of Social Security served on 2/22/2021, answer due 4/23/2021. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certified mail receipts)(Forslund, Jacqueline)
March 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (McAdam, S.)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 5/24/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form) (Maldonado, C)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jacqueline A. Forslund* *Forslund Law LLC* *P.O. Box 4476* *Sunriver, OR 97707*. (Maldonado, C)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Debbie G. Bissmeyer. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Forslund, Jacqueline)
February 19, 2021 Opinion or Order PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0972-9426767. (Bosavanh, Sengthiene)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Bissmeyer v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: S. Wyeth McAdam
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Debbie G. Bissmeyer
Represented By: Jacqueline Anna Forslund
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?