Gilbert v. Ngan et al
Plaintiff: Darren Gilbert
Defendant: C. W. Brower, Inc. and Suheng Ngan Doing business as Paradise Donuts & Sandwiches
Case Number: 1:2021cv00221
Filed: February 19, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 3, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
March 23, 2021 Filing 6 STIPULATION Extend Time to Respond to Complaint by C. W. Brower, Inc.. Attorney Cridland, Graham Matthew added. (Cridland, Graham)
March 16, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Suheng Ngan served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Moore, Tanya)
March 16, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: C. W. Brower, Inc. served on 3/15/2021, answer due 4/5/2021. (Moore, Tanya)
February 22, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
February 22, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *C. W. Brower, Inc., Suheng Ngan* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Tanya E. Moore* *Moore Law Firm, P.C.* *300 South First St., Suite 342* *San Jose, CA 95113*. (Marrujo, C)
February 19, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Asserting Denial of Right of Access Under the Americans with Disabilities Act (ADA) against All Defendants by Darren Gilbert. Attorney Moore, Tanya E. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9427141) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Moore, Tanya)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Gilbert v. Ngan et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Darren Gilbert
Represented By: Tanya E. Moore
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: C. W. Brower, Inc.
Represented By: Graham Matthew Cridland
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Suheng Ngan Doing business as Paradise Donuts & Sandwiches
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?