Haro et al v. Walmart Inc.
Plaintiff: Rochelle Ortega and Amado Haro
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00239
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29:206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 23, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Walmart Inc.. (Knopp, Gregory)
April 23, 2021 Filing 13 ANSWER by Walmart Inc..(Knopp, Gregory)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT AND ORDER. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/1/2021. (Kusamura, W)
March 31, 2021 Filing 11 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Walmart Inc.. (Knopp, Gregory)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 PRO HAC VICE ORDER #9 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/16/2021. Attorney, Nathan Oleson added PHV for Walmart Inc. (Lundstrom, T)
March 16, 2021 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Walmart Inc. for attorney Nathan Oleson to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Knopp, Gregory William added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9479086) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A to Pro Hac Vice Application)(Knopp, Gregory)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER #7 signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 3/11/2021. Attorney, David W. Hodges, PHV added for Amado Haro and Rochelle Ortega. (Lundstrom, T)
March 10, 2021 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amado Haro, Rochelle Ortega for attorney David W. Hodges to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9467372) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Parmet, Matthew)
March 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 2/26/2021. Added attorney Don J. Foty, PHV for Amado Haro, Rochelle Ortega. (Sant Agata, S)
February 25, 2021 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amado Haro, Rochelle Ortega for attorney Don J. Foty to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9438837) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Parmet, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/18/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Walmart Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew S. Parmet* *340 S. Lemon Ave.* *#1228* *Walnut, CA 91789*. (Sant Agata, S)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Amado Haro, Rochelle Ortega (Parmet, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Walmart Inc. by Amado Haro, Rochelle Ortega. Attorney Parmet, Matthew S. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9432347) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Consent)(Parmet, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Haro et al v. Walmart Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Walmart Inc.
Represented By: Gregory William Knopp
Represented By: Nathan Oleson, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rochelle Ortega
Represented By: Matthew S. Parmet
Represented By: Don J. Foty, PHV
Represented By: David W. Hodges, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Amado Haro
Represented By: Matthew S. Parmet
Represented By: Don J. Foty, PHV
Represented By: David W. Hodges, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?