Boone et al v. Amazon Services, LLC
Plaintiff: Roxanne Rivera and Heather Boone
Defendant: Amazon Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00241
Filed: February 23, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Labor: Fair Standards
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 206
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER RE Joint Stipulation to Set Deadline for Plaintiffs to File First Amended Complaint and for Defendant to Respond to the Amended Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 04/15/2021. Amended Complaint due by 5/13/2021; Response to Complaint due by 6/3/2021; Scheduling Conference set for 7/8/2021 at 09:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe.(Flores, E)
April 14, 2021 Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Deadline for Plaintiffs to File First Amended Complaint and for Defendant to Respond to the Amended Complaint Pursuant to L.R. 143 and Fed. R. Civ. P. 15 by Amazon Services, LLC. (Hamburger, Bradley)
April 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): The parties shall appear at the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for May 25, 2021 at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties shall be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 4/7/2021. (Valdez, E)
March 30, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION for Extension of Time for Defendant to Respond to the Complaint Pursuant to Local Rule 144 by Amazon Services, LLC. (Hamburger, Bradley)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER GRANTING #13 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/25/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
March 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER GRANTING #12 Application for Pro Hac Vice signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/25/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
March 25, 2021 Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amazon Services, LLC for attorney Andrew Kilberg to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9501852) (Hamburger, Bradley)
March 25, 2021 Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Amazon Services, LLC for attorney Jason C. Schwartz to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9501835) (Hamburger, Bradley)
March 24, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bradley Joseph Hamburger on behalf of Amazon Services, LLC. Attorney Hamburger, Bradley Joseph added. (Hamburger, Bradley)
March 24, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Amazon Services, LLC. (Smith, Katherine)
March 24, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Katherine V.A. Smith on behalf of Amazon Services, LLC. Attorney Smith, Katherine V.A. added. (Smith, Katherine)
March 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE ORDER Granting #7 Application for Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/8/2021. Added attorney David W. Hodges, PHV for Heather Boone and Roxanne Rivera. (Marrujo, C)
March 8, 2021 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Heather Boone, Roxanne Rivera for attorney David W. Hodges to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9460348) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Parmet, Matthew)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER GRANTING #5 Application for Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/4/2021. Don J. Foty, PHV added for Plaintiff's Heather Boone and Roxanne Rivera. (Marrujo, C)
March 2, 2021 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Heather Boone, Roxanne Rivera for attorney Don J. Foty to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9446431) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Parmet, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/25/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
February 23, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Amazon Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Matthew S. Parmet* *340 S. Lemon Ave.* *#1228* *Walnut, CA 91789*. (Sant Agata, S)
February 23, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Heather Boone, Roxanne Rivera (Parmet, Matthew)
February 23, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Amazon Services, LLC by Heather Boone, Roxanne Rivera. Attorney Parmet, Matthew S. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9432496) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit A - Consent, #2 Exhibit B - Consent)(Parmet, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Boone et al v. Amazon Services, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Roxanne Rivera
Represented By: Matthew S. Parmet
Represented By: Don J. Foty, PHV
Represented By: David W. Hodges, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Heather Boone
Represented By: Matthew S. Parmet
Represented By: Don J. Foty, PHV
Represented By: David W. Hodges, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Amazon Services, LLC
Represented By: Bradley Joseph Hamburger
Represented By: Katherine V.A. Smith
Represented By: Andrew Kilberg, PHV
Represented By: Jason Craig Schwartz, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?