Mpock v. FCA US LLC et al
Plaintiff: Emmanuel C. Mpock
Defendant: Central Valley Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram, FCA US LLC and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00330
Filed: March 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Product Liability
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 15, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
February 15, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 41 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) DUE TO THE FELONY CRIMINAL CALENDAR: Pretrial Conference currently set for 8/11/2023 has been CONTINUED to 11/6/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on February 15, 2023. (Munoz, I)
August 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 8/5/2022. Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US, LLC in place of attorney Garrett B. Stanton and Richard L. Stuhlbarg. (Lawrence, A)
August 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by FCA US, LLC. (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
May 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Emmanuel C. Mpock, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Emmanuel C. Mpock. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
January 29, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Tionna Dolin. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 25, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 STANDING ORDER signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 1/25/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
January 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 1/14/2022: Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures: April 13, 2021. Non-Expert Discovery: September 30, 2022. Expert Disclosure: November 4, 2022. Supplemental Expert Disclosure: November 18, 2022. Expert Discovery: December 23, 2022. Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filing: January 24, 2023. Hearing: Pursuant to Local Rules. Pretrial Conference set for 8/11/2023 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. Jury Trial set for 1/23/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Gonzales, V)
January 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. (Sant Agata, S)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Emmanuel C. Mpock. (Kuemerle, Karin)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER GRANTING #29 Withdrawal of Simi Peterson as Attorney for Plaintiff and Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Simi Peterson as Attorney of Record, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 12/16/2021. Attorney Simi Peterson terminated. (Maldonado, C)
December 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER ADOPTING #25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS, signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 12/15/2021. (Maldonado, C)
December 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by All Plaintiffs. (Kuemerle, Karin)
December 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 RESPONSE by FCA US, LLC to #26 Objections. (Stanton, Garrett)
December 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Karin Kuemerle on behalf of Emmanuel C. Mpock. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
December 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Emmanuel C. Mpock to #25 Order on Motion to Remand,,,,. (Law, Daniel)
November 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 FINDINGS AND RECOMMENDATIONS RECOMMENDING DENYING PLAINTIFF'S REMAND MOTION signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/17/2021. IT IS HEREBY RECOMMENDED that Plaintiffs' motion to remand (ECF No. #11 ) be DENIED. These findings and recommendations are submitted to the district judge assigned to this action, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(B) and this Court's Local Rule 304. Within fourteen (14) days of service of this recommendation, any party may file written objections to these findings and recommendations with the Court and serve a copy on all parties. Such a document should be captioned "Objections to Magistrate Judge's Findings and Recommendations." The district judge will review the magistrate judge's findings and recommendations pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(b)(1)(C). The parties are advised that failure to file objections within the specified time may result in the waiver of rights on appeal. Wilkerson v. Wheeler, 772 F.3d 834, 839 (9th Cir. 2014) (citing Baxter v. Sullivan, 923 F.2d 1391, 1394 (9th Cir. 1991)). (Gonzales, V)
November 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: PLAINTIFF'S #11 MOTION TO REMAND HEARING held on 11/10/2021. The matter is taken under submission, a written order to issue. Plaintiff's Counsel Tionna Dolin present via video. Defendants' Counsel Garrett Stanton present via video. Court Reporter/CD Number: ECRO Otilia Rosales. (Apodaca, P)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Simi Peterson on behalf of Emmanuel C. Mpock. Attorney Peterson, Simi added. (Peterson, Simi)
November 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 ORDER Granting #21 Withdrawal of Regina Lotardo as Attorney for Plaintiff and Directing Clerk of Court to Terminate Regina Lotardo as Attorney of Record signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 11/01/2021. (Flores, E)
October 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 NOTICE To Withdraw an Attorney From the Docket by Emmanuel C. Mpock. (Dolin, Tionna)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Sant Agata, S)
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER SETTING HEARING ON PLAINTIFFS MOTION TO REMAND FOR NOVEMBER 10, 2021 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 10/20/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that a hearing on Plaintiff's motion to remand (ECF No. #11 ) is SET for November 10, 2021 at 10:00 a.m. in Courtroom 9 before the Honorable Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Gonzales, V)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The pending motion to remand #11 is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the preparation of findings and recommendations and/or other appropriate action signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on October 15, 2021. (Munoz, I)
August 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Garrett B. Stanton on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Stanton, Garrett B. added. (Stanton, Garrett)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/24/2021. The July 29, 2021 scheduling conference is CONTINUED to January 13, 2022 at 10:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9; and the parties shall file a joint scheduling report seven (7) days prior to the scheduling conference.(Hernandez, M)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 REPLY by Emmanuel C. Mpock re #11 Motion to Remand,. (Law, Daniel)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPPOSITION by FCA US, LLC to #11 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Monica Y. Hernandez in Support of FCA US LLC's Opposition to Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Exhibit A)(Hernandez, Monica)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are informed that pursuant to Local Rule 302 and the Standing Order Re Judicial Emergency [3-2], the recently-filed motion to remand #11 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. No hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. The hearing date chosen by the filing party serves only to set the opposition and reply filing deadlines. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of the Court's extraordinarily heavy caseload signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on May 3, 2021. (Munoz, I)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Emmanuel C. Mpock in re #11 Motion to Remand,. (Law, Daniel)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 MOTION to REMAND by Emmanuel C. Mpock. Motion Hearing set for 5/28/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Daniel Law in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #3 Proposed Order Granting Plaintiff's Motion To Remand)(Law, Daniel)
April 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Albert Law on behalf of Emmanuel C. Mpock. Attorney Law, Daniel Albert added. (Law, Daniel)
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER CONTINUING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE AND REQUIRING PLAINTIFF TO FILE ANY MOTION TO REMAND WITHIN FOURTEEN DAYS signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/27/2021. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED Plaintiff shall file any motion to remand within fourteen (14) days of the date of entry of this order. The May 4, 2021 scheduling conference is CONTINUED to July 29, 2021 at 9:30 a.m. in Courtroom 9. The parties shall file a joint scheduling report seven (7) days prior to the scheduling conference. (Gonzales, V)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Emmanuel C. Mpock. (Lotardo, Regina)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Emmanuel C. Mpock. (Lotardo, Regina)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Regina Lotardo on behalf of Emmanuel C. Mpock. Attorney Lotardo, Regina added. (Lotardo, Regina)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Monica Yee Hernandez on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Hernandez, Monica)
April 2, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by FCA US, LLC. Attorney Hernandez, Monica Yee added. (Hernandez, Monica)
March 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/4/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by FCA US LLC (Tukloff, Tammara)
March 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Stanislaus Superior Court, case number CV-20-004355 by Emmanuel Mpock. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9455315) (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Tammara N. Bokmuller In Support of FCA US LLC's Notice of Removal, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D, #6 Exhibit E, #7 Exhibit F, #8 Exhibit G, #9 Exhibit H, #10 Exhibit I, #11 Exhibit J, #12 Exhibit K, #13 Exhibit L, #14 Exhibit M, #15 Exhibit N, #16 Exhibit O, #17 Exhibit P, #18 Exhibit Q, #19 Exhibit R, #20 Exhibit S, #21 Exhibit T, #22 Exhibit U, #23 Exhibit V, #24 Exhibit W, #25 Exhibit X, #26 Exhibit Y, #27 Exhibit Z, #28 Exhibit AA, #29 Exhibit BB, #30 Exhibit CC, #31 Exhibit DD, #32 Exhibit EE, #33 Exhibit FF, #34 Exhibit GG, #35 Exhibit HH, #36 Exhibit II, #37 Exhibit JJ, #38 Exhibit KK, #39 Exhibit MM, #40 Exhibit NN, #41 Exhibit OO, #42 Exhibit PP, #43 Exhibit QQ, #44 Exhibit RR, #45 Exhibit SS, #46 Exhibit TT, #47 Exhibit UU, #48 Exhibit VV, #49 Exhibit WW, #50 Exhibit XX, #51 Exhibit YY, #52 Notice of Parties with Financial Interest)(Tukloff, Tammara)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Mpock v. FCA US LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Central Valley Chrysler Jeep Dodge Ram
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Tammara Nicole Tukloff
Represented By: Richard L. Stuhlbarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Tammara Nicole Tukloff
Represented By: Richard L. Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Monica Yee Hernandez
Represented By: Garrett B. Stanton
Represented By: Monica Hernandez
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Emmanuel C. Mpock
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Represented By: Regina Lotardo
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Simi Peterson
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?