(SS) Murillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Lilian Nora Murillo
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00355
Filed: March 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT MINUTE ORDER (Text Only) signed by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller on 5/5/2021: All parties have consented to the jurisdiction of a United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings in this action, including trial and entry of judgment, pursuant to 28 U.S.C. 636(c)(1). Accordingly, this Court AUTHORIZES the action to proceed before the assigned United States Magistrate Judge for all further proceedings including trial and entry of judgment. All further papers filed in this action shall bear the case number 1:21-cv-355 EPG.(Flores, E)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Clark, Carol)
March 30, 2021 Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED. Commissioner of Social Security served on 3/25/2021, answer due 5/24/2021. (Rivera, O)
March 22, 2021 Filing 8 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
March 22, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Lilian Nora Murillo pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/11/2021: The parties are hereby notified that pursuant to General Order Number 615, attached hereto, this action has been stayed pending further order of the court. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, 6, 10. This stay does not prevent, and Plaintiff is directed to proceed with, service of process. (Text Only Entry)(Rooney, M)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL: Consent or Decline due by 6/11/2021. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 Consent Form, #3 USM Instructions) (Rivera, O)
March 10, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Rivera, O)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER on #2 Application to Proceed Without Prepayment of Fees, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 3/10/2021. (Rivera, O)
March 9, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Maldonado, C)
March 8, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Lilian Nora Murillo. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
March 8, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Lilian Nora Murillo by Lilian Nora Murillo. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Murillo v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Lilian Nora Murillo
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Represented By: Carol Sue Clark
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?