Amaro et al v. Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.
Plaintiff: Javier Barrera and Rafael Marquez Amaro
Defendant: Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00382
Filed: March 11, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 1801
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Filing 6 REPLY by Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc. re #4 Motion to Dismiss,. (Campagne, Thomas)
April 21, 2021 Filing 5 OPPOSITION by Rafael Marquez Amaro to #4 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 REQUEST FOR JUDICIAL NOTICE IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RAFAEL MARQUEZ AMARO AND JAVIER BARRERAS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BEE SWEET CITRUS INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) AND FRCP 12(f), AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR FRCP 56(a) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, THAT THIS CASE BE DISMISSED AS DUPLICATIVE OF CASE NO. 1:20-CV- 01162-NONE-EPG PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-TO-FILE RULE., #2 Exhibit 1, #3 Exhibit 2, #4 Exhibit 3, #5 Exhibit 4, #6 Exhibit 5, #7 Declaration DECLARATION OF ARI J. STILLER IN SUPPORT OF PLAINTIFFS RAFAEL MARQUEZ AMARO AND JAVIER BARRERAS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT BEE SWEET CITRUS INC.S MOTION TO DISMISS UNDER FRCP 12(b)(6) AND FRCP 12(f), AND/OR IN THE ALTERNATIVE, FOR FRCP 56(a) MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT, THAT THIS CASE BE DISMISSED AS DUPLICATIVE OF CASE NO. 1:20-CV- 01162-NONE-EPG PURSUANT TO THE FIRST-TO-FILE RULE., #8 Exhibit 6)(Kingsley, Eric)
April 2, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to DISMISS by Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.. Attorney Campagne, Thomas Elmer added. Motion Hearing set for 5/5/2021 at 09:30 PM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memorandum of Points and Authorities In Support of Motion, #2 Declaration Meet and Confer Declaration, #3 Exhibit Exhibit to Meet and Confer Declaration, #4 Declaration Declaration In Support of Motion, #5 Exhibit Exhibits to Declaration In Support of Motion)(Campagne, Thomas)
March 11, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 11:00 AM in Yosemite (JDP) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
March 11, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc. * with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Ariel J. Stiller* *Kingsley & Kingsley, APC* *16133 Ventura Blvd., Suite 1200* *Encino, CA 91436*. (Maldonado, C)
March 11, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT Class Action against All Defendants by Rafael Marquez Amaro, Javier Barrera. Attorney Stillershulman, Ariel J. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9468626) (Attachments: #1 Ex A to Class Action Complaint, #2 Ex B to Class Action Complaint, #3 Ex C to Class Action Complaint, #4 Ex D to Class Action Complaint, #5 Ex E to Class Action Complaint, #6 Civil Cover Sheet)(Stillershulman, Ariel)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Amaro et al v. Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Javier Barrera
Represented By: Edgar I. Aguilasocho
Represented By: Eric Bryce Kingsley
Represented By: Liane Katzenstein Ly
Represented By: Kelsey Szamet
Represented By: Ariel J. Stillershulman
Represented By: Mario Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Rafael Marquez Amaro
Represented By: Edgar I. Aguilasocho
Represented By: Eric Bryce Kingsley
Represented By: Liane Katzenstein Ly
Represented By: Kelsey Szamet
Represented By: Ariel J. Stillershulman
Represented By: Mario Martinez
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Bee Sweet Citrus, Inc.
Represented By: Thomas Elmer Campagne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?