California Capital Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al
Plaintiff: California Capital Insurance Company
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC and A.O. Smith Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00388
Filed: March 10, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Tort Product Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 23, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by California Capital Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference)(Noma, Sally)
April 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 CLERKS NOTICE to Attorney Sally Noma re #11 NOTICE: Your filing is entitled Notice, however, the actual document attached is a Certificate of Service. Please re-file your document using the correct event Certificate of Service under the category, Initial Pleadings and Service > Service of Process. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Rivera, O)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 NOTICE of Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference by All Plaintiffs. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Proof of Service - Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference)(Noma, Sally)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 REPLY by A.O. Smith Corporation re #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (Smith, Deborah)
April 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 OPPOSITION by California Capital Insurance Company to #6 Motion to Dismiss/Lack of Jurisdiction,. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order [PROPOSED] ORDER ON PLAINTIFFS OPPOSITION TO DEFENDANT A. O. SMITH CORPORATIONS MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FOR LACK OF PERSONAL JURISDICTION UNDER FED. R. CIV. P. 12(b)(2), #2 Proof of Service)(Noma, Sally)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Smith, Deborah)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Smith, Deborah)
March 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS for LACK of JURISDICTION by A.O. Smith Corporation. Motion Hearing set for 4/15/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Declaration of Deborah Smith, #2 Declaration of Wendy Grant, #3 Proposed Order)(Smith, Deborah)
March 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Plaintiff California Capital Insurance Company's Certificate of Service - CONSENT OF U.S. MAGISTRATE JUDGE JURISDICTION)(Noma, Sally)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/1/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL COVER SHEET by A.O. Smith Corporation (Smith, Deborah)
March 11, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERKS NOTICE to Attorney Deborah Smith: Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Rivera, O)
March 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno County Superior Court, case number 21CECG00269 by A.O. Smith Corporation. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9467917) (Smith, Deborah)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: California Capital Insurance Company v. Broan-Nutone, LLC et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Broan-Nutone, LLC
Represented By: Peter Stirling Doody
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: A.O. Smith Corporation
Represented By: Florence A. McClain
Represented By: Deborah Ann Smith
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: California Capital Insurance Company
Represented By: Sally Noma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?