Tulare Golf Course, LLC v. Vantage Tag, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Tulare Golf Course, LLC
Defendant: Vantage Tag, Inc., Arrow Capital Solutions, Inc. and U.S. Bank National Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv00505
Filed: March 25, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28:1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on June 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 21, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Time to Respond to Complaint by Arrow Capital Solutions, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jeffcoach, Mandy)
May 5, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *U.S. Bank National Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Leonard Charles Herr* *Herr Pedersen & Berglund, LLP* *100 Willow Plaza, Suite 300* *Visalia, CA 93291-1351*. (Flores, E)
May 4, 2021 Filing 11 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against U.S. Bank National Association by Tulare Golf Course, LLC.(Herr, Leonard)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 CLERK'S NOTICE of DOCKET CORRECTION re #8 Amended Document: Please disregard ECF No. #8 as wrong event was used. Attorney will need to re-file document using the correct event Amended Complaint. (Marrujo, C)
April 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 ORDER EXTENDING TIME FOR DEFENDANT ARROW CAPITAL SOLUTIONS, INC. TO FILE A RESPONSIVE PLEADING, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 4/29/2021. (Kusamura, W)
April 29, 2021 Filing 8 ***DISREGARD - See Clerk's Notice ECF 10*** AMENDED DOCUMENT by Tulare Golf Course, LLC: Amended #1 Complaint. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet to Verified First Amended Complaint)(Herr, Leonard)
April 28, 2021 Filing 7 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for EXTENDING TIME TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT by Arrow Capital Solutions, Inc.. Attorney Jeffcoach, Mandy Louise added. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Jeffcoach, Mandy)
April 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Vantage Tag, Inc. served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (Herr, Leonard)
April 19, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Arrow Capital Solutions, Inc. served on 4/6/2021, answer due 4/27/2021. (Herr, Leonard)
April 19, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Herr, Leonard)
March 25, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 6/15/2021 at 09:45 AM in Courtroom 7 (SKO) before Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
March 25, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Arrow Capital Solutions, Inc., Vantage Tag, Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Leonard C. Herr* *100 Willow Plaza* *Suite 300* *Visalia, CA 93291*. (Maldonado, C)
March 25, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against All Defendants by Tulare Golf Course, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9501272) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil Cover Sheet)(Herr, Leonard)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Tulare Golf Course, LLC v. Vantage Tag, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Vantage Tag, Inc.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Arrow Capital Solutions, Inc.
Represented By: Mandy Louise Jeffcoach
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: U.S. Bank National Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Tulare Golf Course, LLC
Represented By: Rhea Y. Ikemiya
Represented By: Leonard Charles Herr
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?