(SS) Carlos v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Bertha Chavez Carlos
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00517
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42:402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADVISING PARTIES OF STAY OF ACTION PURSUANT TO GENERAL ORDER 615 signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 4/27/2021. Pursuant to General Order Number 615, this action has been stayed and the stay will be automatically lifted when the Commissioner files the certified copy of the administrative record. See E.D. Cal. G.O. No. 615, 6, 10; see also 11 (setting forth good cause requirement to request lifting of stay in a specific case). (Gonzales, V)
April 26, 2021 Filing 10 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Bertha Chavez Carlos. Commissioner of Social Security served on 4/21/2021, answer due 6/21/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
April 19, 2021 Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
April 19, 2021 Filing 8 NOTICE OF SUBMITTING SERVICE DOCUMENTS to the U.S. Marshal by Bertha Chavez Carlos pursuant to order of the court. (Pena, Jonathan)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL Consent or Decline due by 7/15/2021 (Attachments: #1 SAB Soc Sec, #2 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER GRANTING #4 Motion to Proceed IFP ;ORDER DIRECTING Clerk of Court to Issue Summons, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/09/2021. (Attachments: #1 USM SS Instructions) (Martin-Gill, S)
April 9, 2021 Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Bertha Chavez Carlos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP without prejudice and requiring Plaintiff to file long form application signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/29/2021. Motion for IFP due within 20-Days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application). (Lundstrom, T)
March 29, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Rivera, O)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Bertha Chavez Carlos. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Bertha Chavez Carlos. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Carlos v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Bertha Chavez Carlos
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?