Sentry Select Insurance Company v. Norcold, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Sentry Select Insurance Company
Defendant: Thetford Corporation, Norcold, Inc. and Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv00521
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 SCHEDULING ORDER Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures: July 2, 2021; Non-Expert Discovery: June 25, 2022; Expert Disclosure: June 24, 2022; Supplemental Expert Disclosure: July 25, 2022; Expert Discovery: August 25, 2022. Dispositive Motion Filing Deadline: July 25, 2022. Pre-Trial Conference: January 16, 2023 at 1:30 pm Courtroom 4. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/27/2021. (Timken, A)
May 27, 2021 Filing 14 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 5/27/2021. The Court to issue a Scheduling Conference Order. "SAB Chambers Procedures" emailed to the parties. Plaintiffs Counsel Tom Nagashima via video present. Defendants Counsel Dean Pollack via video present. Court Reporter/CD Number: via video - off record. (Hernandez, M)
May 27, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #15 Scheduling Order, served on Ulla M. Pajala NACED. (Timken, A)
May 25, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Dean Pollack on behalf of Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Norcold, Inc., Thetford Corporation. Attorney Pollack, Dean added. (Pollack, Dean)
May 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/21/2021: (Text Only Entry). The Court moves the TIME ONLY of the Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2021. The Scheduling Conference will now be heard at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. The parties will be provided with the video conference information. (Hernandez, M)
May 21, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: 12 Minute Order changing time of the Scheduling Conference served on Ulla M. Pajala NACED. (Hernandez, M)
May 20, 2021 Filing 11 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Sentry Select Insurance Company. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Nagashima, Tom)
May 4, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gregory D. Brown on behalf of Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Norcold, Inc., Thetford Corporation. Attorney Brown, Gregory D. added. (Brown, Gregory)
April 6, 2021 Filing 9 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sabnis, Rohit)
April 6, 2021 Filing 8 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Thetford Corporation. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sabnis, Rohit)
April 6, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Norcold, Inc.. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service)(Sabnis, Rohit)
April 2, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ulla Maarit Pajala on behalf of Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Norcold, Inc., Thetford Corporation. Attorney Pajala, Ulla Maarit added. (Pajala, Ulla)
March 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANT TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. SEVEN DAY DEADLINE. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendant shall file a responsive pleading within seven (7) days of the date of entry of this order. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 3/29/2021(Hernandez, M)
March 30, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #5 Order, served on Tom T. Nagashima NACED, Ulla M. Pajala NACED. (Hernandez, M)
March 29, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE directing Attorneys Tom T. Nagashima, NCAED and Ulla M. Pajala, NCAED to submit a Petition to Practice in the Eastern District of California. (Lundstrom, T)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/27/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of California, County of Fresno, case number 20CECG02922 by All Plaintiffs. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9507404) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exhibit A, #2 Exhibit Exhibit B, #3 Exhibit Exhibit C, #4 Exhibit Exhibit D, #5 Exhibit Exhibit E, #6 Exhibit Exhibit F, #7 Exhibit Exhibit G, #8 Exhibit Exhibit H, #9 Exhibit Exhibit I, #10 Exhibit Exhibit J)(Sabnis, Rohit)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation, Norcold, Inc., Thetford Corporation (Sabnis, Rohit)
March 29, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Civil New Case Documents, #4 Notice - Other served on Tom T. Nagashima NACED and Ulla M. Pajala NACED. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Sentry Select Insurance Company v. Norcold, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Sentry Select Insurance Company
Represented By: Tom T. Nagashima, NACED
Represented By: Tom T. Nagashima
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Thetford Corporation
Represented By: Ulla M. Pajala, NACED
Represented By: Rohit A. Sabnis
Represented By: Gregory D. Brown
Represented By: Dean Pollack
Represented By: Ulla Maarit Pajala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Norcold, Inc.
Represented By: Ulla M. Pajala, NACED
Represented By: Rohit A. Sabnis
Represented By: Gregory D. Brown
Represented By: Dean Pollack
Represented By: Ulla Maarit Pajala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Dyson-Kissner-Moran Corporation
Represented By: Rohit A. Sabnis
Represented By: Ulla M. Pajala, NACED
Represented By: Gregory D. Brown
Represented By: Dean Pollack
Represented By: Ulla Maarit Pajala
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?