Kamlade v. LEO Pharma Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Brian Kamlade
Defendant: LEO Pharma A/S and LEO Pharma Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00522
Filed: March 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Personal Property: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 16, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 PRO HAC VICE ORDER GRANTING #7 Application signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/15/2021. Added attorney Michael X. Imbroscio, PHV for LEO Pharma Inc.(Flores, E)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 PRO HAC VICE ORDER GRANTING #6 Application signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/15/2021. Added attorney Marianne F. Kies, PHV for LEO Pharma Inc.(Flores, E)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE ORDER GRANTING #8 Application signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/15/2021. Added attorney Andrew Soukup, PHV for LEO Pharma Inc.(Flores, E)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER GRANTING #9 Application signed by signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/15/2021. Added attorney Alyssa Vallar, PHV for LEO Pharma Inc.(Flores, E)
April 14, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant LEO Pharma Inc.. (Huang, Sylvia)
April 14, 2021 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by LEO Pharma Inc. for attorney Alyssa Vallar to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9543428) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Huang, Sylvia)
April 14, 2021 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by LEO Pharma Inc. for attorney Andrew Soukup to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9543389) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Huang, Sylvia)
April 14, 2021 Filing 7 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by LEO Pharma A/S, LEO Pharma Inc. for attorney Michael X. Imbroscio to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9543358) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Huang, Sylvia)
April 14, 2021 Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by LEO Pharma A/S, LEO Pharma Inc. for attorney Marianne F. Kies to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9543276) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Good Standing)(Huang, Sylvia)
April 14, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sylvia Huang on behalf of LEO Pharma A/S, LEO Pharma Inc.. Attorney Huang, Sylvia added. (Huang, Sylvia)
April 6, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to LEO Pharma Inc. on 4/1/2021, Answer due 6/1/2021 (Fisher, Lawrence)
March 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
March 29, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *LEO Pharma A/S, LEO Pharma Inc.* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Timothy Fisher* *1990 North California Blvd* *Suite 940* *Walnut Creek, CA 94596*. (Maldonado, C)
March 29, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against LEO Pharma A/S, LEO Pharma Inc. by Brian Kamlade. Attorney Fisher, Lawrence Timothy added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9508195) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Fisher, Lawrence)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Kamlade v. LEO Pharma Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEO Pharma A/S
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: LEO Pharma Inc.
Represented By: Michael X. Imbroscio, PHV
Represented By: Alyssa Vallar, PHV
Represented By: Andrew Soukup, PHV
Represented By: Sylvia Huang
Represented By: Marianne F. Kies, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Brian Kamlade
Represented By: Lawrence Timothy Fisher
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?