Avalos v. Miranda, et al.
Plaintiff: George Avalos
Defendant: Gabriel Felix Miranda, Margarita Junuen Alaniz Duarte and Paul E. Franklin
Case Number: 1:2021cv00537
Filed: March 30, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Americans with Disabilities - Other
Cause of Action: 42:12101
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on April 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
April 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER RE: Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Entire Action with Prejudice signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 4/28/2021. CASE CLOSED. (Sant Agata, S)
April 27, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by George Avalos. (Manning, Joseph)
April 26, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of SETTLEMENT by George Avalos. Dispositional Docs due by 5/20/2021. (Manning, Joseph)
April 22, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Margarita Junuen Alaniz Duarte served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Manning, Joseph)
April 22, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Gabriel Felix Miranda served on 4/15/2021, answer due 5/6/2021. (Manning, Joseph)
April 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER RE: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF DEFENDANT PAUL E. FRANKLIN WITHOUT PREJUDICE, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 04/16/2021. Paul E. Franklin terminated.(Martin-Gill, S)
April 15, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL by George Avalos. (Manning, Joseph)
March 30, 2021 Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/1/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
March 30, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Margarita Junuen Alaniz Duarte, Paul E. Franklin, Gabriel Felix Miranda* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Joseph R. Manning, Jr.* *Manning Law, APC* *20062 SW Birch Street, Suite 200* *Newport Beach, CA 92660*. (Lundstrom, T)
March 30, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by George Avalos (Manning, Joseph)
March 30, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT George Avalos against All Defendants by George Avalos. Attorney Manning, Joseph R. added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9510969) (Manning, Joseph)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Avalos v. Miranda, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gabriel Felix Miranda
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Margarita Junuen Alaniz Duarte
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul E. Franklin
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: George Avalos
Represented By: Joseph R. Manning, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?