Partanen v. Western United States Pipe Band Association
Plaintiff: John Eric Partanen
Defendant: Western United States Pipe Band Association
Case Number: 1:2021cv00588
Filed: April 8, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Assault Libel & Slander
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 27, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 28, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #11 Order served on John Eric Partanen. (Maldonado, C)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 STATEMENT In Favor of Declaratory Relief That the Defendant Comply With Its Bylaws and Contest Rules, filed by Plaintiff John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 STATEMENT In Favor of Equitable Relief Reinstating the Plaintiff's Membership in the WUSPBA, and Restoring the Plaintiff's Personal Rights to Compete as a Solo Bagpiper and as a Piper in a Member Band of the WUSPBA, filed by Plaintiff John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 MOTION for Equitable Relief to Restore the Plaintiff's Membership in the WUSPBA and to Restore the Plaintiff's Personal Rights to Compete as a Solo Bagpiper and as a Leader of a WUSPBA Member Bagpipe Band, by John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 MOTION to Declare the WUSPBA 2020 Annual General Meeting Null and Void, by John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MOTION Requiring Defendant Comply With It's Bylaws and Contest Rules by John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MOTION for Declaratory Relief, by John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 NOTICE of Motion, by John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MOTION to AMEND the #1 Complaint by John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER Disregarding Stipulation on Defendant's Response to Complaint Due Date, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 05/26/2021. (Maldonado, C)
May 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 *** DISREGARDED per Order *** STIPULATION on Defendant's Response to Complaint Due Date, by John Eric Partanen. (Marrujo, C)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Western United States Pipe Band Association served on 4/27/2021, answer due 5/18/2021. (Martin-Gill, S)
April 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS to 3715 Burr St., Space Number 85, Bakersfield, CA 93388 by John Eric Partanen. (Maldonado, C) (Physical Address Only)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 Informational Order) (Lundstrom, T)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Western United States Pipe Band Association* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *John Eric Partanen* *Pro Se* *P.O. Box 5786* *Bakersfield, CA 93388*. (Lundstrom, T)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #1 Complaint, #6 Civil New Case Documents, #5 Summons served on John Eric Partanen. (Lundstrom, T)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 NOTICE re Voluntary Dispute Resolution Program by John Eric Partanen. (Maldonado, C)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 STATEMENT by Plaintiff John Eric Partanen. (Lundstrom, T)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 STIPULATION to participate in Alternative Dispute Resolution by John Eric Partanen. (Lundstrom, T)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lundstrom, T)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Western United States Pipe Band Association by John Eric Partanen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet). (Lundstrom, T)
April 8, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100048063 $402.00 fbo John Eric Partanen by John Eric Partanen on 4/9/2021. (Lundstrom, T)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Partanen v. Western United States Pipe Band Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: John Eric Partanen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Western United States Pipe Band Association
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?