(PC) Freeman v. Clark et al
Plaintiff: Leroy Freeman
Defendant: Celia Bell, Ken Clark, Conall McCabe, Khin Aye, Annette Williams, Catherine Nacar, Shawn Autrey and Cony Bencito
Case Number: 1:2021cv00611
Filed: April 12, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Christopher D Baker
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983 Prisoner Civil Rights
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 14, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
December 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 43 SCHEDULING ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 12/14/2022. Discovery Deadlines: Initial Disclosures: January 11, 2023; Non-Expert: October 1, 2023; Expert: February 1, 2024; Mid-Discovery Status Conf.: June 20, 2023; Non-Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filing: November 15, 2023; Hearing: December 20, 2023; Dispositive Motion Deadlines: Filing: December 15, 2023; Hearing: February 1, 2024; Status Conference set for 6/20/2023 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker; Pretrial Conference set for 4/8/2024 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston; Jury Trial set for 6/11/2024 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 4 (JLT) before District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston.(Flores, E)
December 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 42 MINUTES (Text Only) for proceedings held via video conference before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker: SCHEDULING CONFERENCE held on 12/14/2022. Case scheduled. Court to issue Scheduling Order. Plaintiffs Counsel Greg Garrotto present via video. Defendants Counsel Gigi Knudtson present via video. Court Reporter: off the record. (Hall, S)
December 5, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 41 JOINT SCHEDULING REPORT by Leroy Freeman. (Garrotto, Greg)
November 8, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 40 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry), signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 11/8/2022: Upon agreement of the parties, a Scheduling Conference is set for 12/14/2022 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely via Zoom video conference, and counsel may obtain the Zoom ID and password from the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. Consistent with the Court's order of 4/13/2021 (Doc. #4 ), the parties are reminded to file a joint scheduling report at least one week prior to the scheduling conference. (Hall, S)
November 7, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 39 ORDER ADOPTING #35 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER GRANTING #20 Motion to Dismiss ; ORDER DIRECTING Clerk to terminate Defendants: Clark and Bell on the Court's Docket; ORDERED that this case be referred to the assigned Magistrate Judge for further proceedings, signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/7/2022. ( Celia Bell (in her official capacity as Health Care CEO at California State Prison-Corcoran) and Ken Clark (in his official capacity as Warden at California State Prison-Corcoran) terminated)(Martin-Gill, S)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 38 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Bakersfield Magistrate Judge (BAK) to Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker for all further proceedings. (Lawrence, A)
September 26, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 ORDER overruling Plaintiff's Objections to Order and Request for Reconsideration #36 signed by District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 9/26/2022. (Lundstrom, T)
September 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 MOTION for RECONSIDERATION re #35 Findings and Recommendations (Motion), by Leroy Freeman. (Garrotto, Greg)
September 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 35 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Defendants Clark and Bell's #20 Motion to Dismiss be Granted signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 09/22/2022. Referred to Judge Thurston; Objections to F&R due within Fourteen-Days. (Flores, E)
May 9, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 CLERK'S NOTICE : Attn: Gigi Knudtson as to #33 , all updates to account need to made through PACER.GOV. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 4, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 33 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Gigi M Knudtson. Attorney Knudtson, Gigi M added. (Knudtson, Gigi)
January 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Shawn Autrey, Khin Aye, Cony Bencito, Conall McCabe, Catherine Nacar, Annette Williams. Attorney Longyear, Dayton Van Vranken added.(Longyear, Dayton)
January 21, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 1/21/2022: In light of the pending Motion to Dismiss, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/7/2022 is VACATED. Within ten days after the issuance of the ruling on the Motion to Dismiss, should the matter go forward, the parties are directed to contact Courtroom Deputy Susan Hall (shall@caed.uscourts.gov) to secure a new scheduling conference date. (Text Only Entry)(Hall, S)
January 10, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 30 ORDER by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is reassigned from *Unassigned DJ* to District Judge Jennifer L. Thurston for all further proceedings. Documents filed in this case shall continue to include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(EPG)* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate is appointed. (Rivera, O)
January 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 29 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(EPG)* (Lundstrom, T)
November 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Greg Wegner Garrotto. (Garrotto, Greg)
November 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 27 REPLY by Celia Bell, Ken Clark re #26 Opposition to Motion. Attorney Cahill, Nicole Marie added. (Cahill, Nicole)
November 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 26 OPPOSITION by Leroy Freeman to #20 Motion to Dismiss,. (Garrotto, Greg)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Sant Agata, S)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 24 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/2021: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear for Ken Clark in place of attorney Joseph R. Wheeler.(Flores, E)
October 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER SUBSTITUTING ATTORNEY signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/26/2021: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear for Celia Bell in place of attorney Joseph R. Wheeler.(Flores, E)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Celia Bell. (Longyear, Dayton)
October 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by Ken Clark. (Longyear, Dayton)
October 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 MOTION to DISMISS by Celia Bell, Ken Clark. Motion Hearing set for 11/23/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Defs Clark & Bell's MTD Plaintiff's FAC, #2 Proof of Service)(Wheeler, Joseph)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER GRANTING #18 Stipulation to Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/15/2021. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 2/7/2022 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
October 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for To Vacate and Reset Scheduling Conference re #10 Stipulation and Order,, Set/Reset Deadlines and Hearings, by Celia Bell, Ken Clark. (Wheeler, Joseph)
October 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Shawn Autrey, Khin Aye, Cony Bencito, Conall McCabe, Catherine Nacar, Annette Williams* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Greg Wegner Garrotto* *Law Offices of Greg W. Garrotto* *1925 Century Park E, Suite 2000* *Los Angeles, CA 90067-2500*. (Marrujo, C)
October 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Leroy Freeman.(Garrotto, Greg)
September 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 ORDER ADOPTING #14 Findings and Recommendations and ORDER GRANTING #7 Defendants' Motion to Dismiss signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/21/2021. Amended Complaint due within thirty (30) days. (Jessen, A)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 ORDER VACATING the Hearing Date of July 21, 2021; FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that #7 Defendant's Motion to Dismiss be Granted re #1 Complaint signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 7/19/2021. Referred to Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R due within fourteen (14) days. (Jessen, A)
July 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 REPLY by Celia Bell, Ken Clark re #12 Opposition to Motion. (Wheeler, Joseph)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 OPPOSITION by Leroy Freeman to #7 Motion to Dismiss. (Garrotto, Greg)
June 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Wheeler, Joseph)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 STIPULATION and ORDER #9 to Reset the Scheduling Conference, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 6/23/2021. Scheduling Conference CONTINUED to 10/25/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Hall, S)
June 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Resetting Scheduling Conference by Celia Bell, Ken Clark. (Wheeler, Joseph)
June 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER: (Text Only Entry) The recently-filed motion to dismiss #7 is referred to the assigned magistrate judge for the preparation of findings and recommendations. Minute order signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 6/22/2021. (Gonzales, V)
June 21, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MOTION to DISMISS by Celia Bell, Ken Clark. Motion Hearing set for 7/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 4 before UnassignedDJ. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Proof of Service)(Wheeler, Joseph)
June 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Joseph R. Wheeler for Celia Bell,Joseph R. Wheeler for Ken Clark, attorney Joanna Breiden Hood terminated (Wheeler, Joseph)
May 6, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Celia Bell on 4/13/2021, Answer due 6/14/2021; Ken Clark on 4/13/2021, Answer due 6/14/2021. Attorney Hood, Joanna Breiden added as counsel of record. (Hood, Joanna)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 7/12/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (JLT) before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
April 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Celia Bell, Ken Clark* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Greg W. Garrotto* *LAW OFFICES OF GREG W. GARROTTO* *1925 Century Park East, Suite 2000* *Los Angeles, California 90067*. (Maldonado, C)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Leroy Freeman (Garrotto, Greg)
April 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against celia bell, ken clark by Leroy Freeman. Attorney Garrotto, Greg Wegner added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9537522) (Garrotto, Greg)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Freeman v. Clark et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Leroy Freeman
Represented By: Greg Wegner Garrotto
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Celia Bell
Represented By: Joanna Breiden Hood
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler
Represented By: Gigi M Knudtson
Represented By: Nicole M Cahill
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Ken Clark
Represented By: Joanna Breiden Hood
Represented By: Joseph R. Wheeler
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Represented By: Gigi M Knudtson
Represented By: Nicole M Cahill
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Conall McCabe
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Represented By: Gigi M Knudtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Khin Aye
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Represented By: Gigi M Knudtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Annette Williams
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Represented By: Gigi M Knudtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Catherine Nacar
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Represented By: Gigi M Knudtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Shawn Autrey
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Represented By: Gigi M Knudtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Cony Bencito
Represented By: Dayton Van Vranken Longyear
Represented By: Gigi M Knudtson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?