Chandavong et al v. Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association et al
Plaintiff: Latana M. Chandavong and Neng Her
Defendant: Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association and County of Fresno
Case Number: 1:2021cv00675
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Referring Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Nature of Suit: Constitutional - State Statute
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 22, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 1, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 31 Stipulation and Order extending deadline for Defendants to respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/1/2021. (Filing Deadline: 8/25/2021) (Rosales, O.)
May 26, 2021 Filing 30 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extension of Deadline for Defendants to Respond to Plaintiffs' Third Amended Complaint by Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association. (Alonso, Monique)
May 13, 2021 Filing 29 THIRD AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Fresno, Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association by Neng Her, Latana M. Chandavong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 28 ORDER Following Additional Briefing and ORDER SEVERING Matter signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 04/21/2021. Amended Complaint due within Twenty-One Days. (Flores, E)
January 25, 2021 Filing 27 REPLY by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong, Neng Her, Nick Vang, Hugh X. Yang re 81 Reply. (Mitchell, Jonathan) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
January 25, 2021 Filing 26 REPLY by County of Fresno re 82 Response to Order to Show Cause. (Cederborg, Daniel) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 25 RESPONSE to 79 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong, Neng Her, Nick Vang, Hugh X. Yang. (Mitchell, Jonathan) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
January 11, 2021 Filing 24 REPLY by County of Fresno re 79 Order. (Cederborg, Daniel) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
December 17, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 23 ORDER DISMISSING CLAIMS AND ORDER FOR ADDITIONAL BRIEFING signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 12/17/2020. (Gonzales, V) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
December 4, 2020 Filing 22 REPLY by County of Fresno re 74 Order on Motion to Dismiss. (Cederborg, Daniel) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
December 3, 2020 Filing 21 MOTION Dismissal on OSC re 74 Order on Motion to Dismiss by County of Fresno. (Cederborg, Daniel) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
November 26, 2020 Filing 20 RESPONSE to 74 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong, Neng Her, Nick Vang, Hugh X. Yang. (Mitchell, Jonathan) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
November 12, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 19 ORDER ON DEFENDANTS' MOTIONS TO DISMISS, ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE, AND ORDER VACATING HEARING signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 11/11/2020. (Gonzales, V) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
June 29, 2020 Filing 18 REPLY by Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association to RESPONSE to 65 Motion to Dismiss,. (Alonso, Monique) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
June 23, 2020 Filing 17 RESPONSE by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong, Neng Her, Nick Vang, Hugh X. Yang to 65 Motion to Dismiss,. (Mitchell, Jonathan) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
June 2, 2020 Filing 16 MOTION to DISMISS by Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association. Motion Hearing set for 7/6/2020 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Alonso, Monique) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
April 10, 2020 Filing 15 ANSWER by County of Fresno. (Cederborg, Daniel) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
March 19, 2020 Filing 14 SECOND AMENDED COMPLAINT against County of Fresno, Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association, Nick Vang by Hugh X. Yang, Neng Her, Nick Vang. Attorney Mitchell, Jonathan F. added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Exhibit 10, #11 Exhibit 11, #12 Exhibit 12, #13 Exhibit 13, #14 Exhibit 14, #15 Exhibit 15, #16 Exhibit 16, #17 Exhibit 17, #18 Exhibit 18, #19 Exhibit 19, #20 Exhibit 20, #21 Exhibit 21, #22 Exhibit 22, #23 Exhibit 23, #24 Exhibit 24)(Flores, E)
February 27, 2020 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER on Defendants' Motions to Dismiss, 36, 40, 44, signed by District Judge Anthony W. Ishii on 2/27/2020. Amended Complaint Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Marrujo, C) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
September 3, 2019 Filing 12 REPLY by Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association re 44 AMENDED MOTION to DISMISS amending 40 MOTION to DISMISS. (Alonso, Monique) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
August 26, 2019 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong, Neng Her, Hugh X. Yang to 44 AMENDED MOTION to DISMISS amending 40 MOTION to DISMISS. (Mitchell, Jonathan) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
July 29, 2019 Filing 10 AMENDED MOTION to DISMISS amending 40 MOTION to DISMISS by Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association. Motion Hearing set for 9/9/2019 at 01:30 PM in Courtroom 2 (AWI) before District Judge Anthony W. Ishii. (Attachments: # 1 Memorandum MPA iso Amended Motion to Dismiss, # 2 Declaration of Eric Schmidt iso Amended Motion to Dismiss)(Alonso, Monique) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
June 24, 2019 Filing 9 ANSWER by County of Fresno, County of Fresno. Attorney Cederborg, Daniel Carl added.(Cederborg, Daniel) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
May 12, 2019 Filing 8 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against Xavier Becerra, County of Fresno, Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association, Neng Her, Hugh X. Yang by Latana M. Chandavong, Cesar Campos, Neng Her, Hugh X. Yang. Attorney Mitchell, Jonathan F. added. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit, #2 Exhibit, #3 Exhibit, #4 Exhibit, #5 Exhibit, #6 Exhibit, #7 Exhibit, #8 Exhibit, #9 Exhibit, #10 Exhibit, #11 Exhibit, #12 Exhibit, #13 Exhibit, #14 Exhibit, #15 Exhibit, #16 Exhibit, #17 Exhibit, #18 Exhibit, #19 Exhibit, #20 Exhibit, #21 Exhibit, #22 Exhibit)(Mitchell, Jonathan) (Flores, E) (Entered: 04/22/2021)
April 29, 2019 Filing 7 ANSWER by Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association.(Alonso, Monique) (Flores, E)
February 1, 2019 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 2/1/2019. Added attorney Talcott J. Franklin, PHV for Cesar Campos. (Sant Agata, S) (Flores, E)
February 1, 2019 Filing 5 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong for attorney Talcott J. Franklin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Benbrook, Bradley)
January 4, 2019 Filing 4 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong for attorney Talcott Franklin to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8043657) (Benbrook, Bradley)
December 12, 2018 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRO HAC VICE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 12/11/18. (Flores, E)
December 11, 2018 Filing 2 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Cesar Campos, Latana M. Chandavong for attorney Jonathan F. Mitchell to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-8007370) (Flores, E)
December 6, 2018 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against County of Fresno, Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association by Neng Her, Latana M. Chandavong. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2, #3 Exhibit 3, #4 Exhibit 4, #5 Exhibit 5, #6 Exhibit 6, #7 Exhibit 7, #8 Exhibit 8, #9 Exhibit 9, #10 Civil Cover Sheet)(Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Chandavong et al v. Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Latana M. Chandavong
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Represented By: Bradley A. Benbrook
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Neng Her
Represented By: Jonathan F. Mitchell, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Fresno Deputy Sheriff's Association
Represented By: Monique Alonso
Represented By: Gary Marc Messing
Represented By: Jason H. Jasmine
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: County of Fresno
Represented By: Catherine Ellen Basham
Represented By: Daniel Carl Cederborg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?