(SS) Juarez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Maria Juarez
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv00680
Filed: April 22, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 402
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 5, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
May 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER ADVISING PARTIES OF STAY OF ACTION pursuant to General Order 615. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 5/27/2021. (Timken, A)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Pena, Jonathan)
May 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED by Maria Juarez. Commissioner of Social Security served on 5/26/2021, answer due 7/26/2021. (Attachments: #1 Exhibit)(Pena, Jonathan)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 SCHEDULING ORDER and ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL (Attachments: #1 FRS SS Sch, #2 Consent Form) (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Jonathan Omar Pena* *Pena & Bromberg, Attorneys at Law* *2440 Tulare St., Suite 320* *Fresno, CA 93721*. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING as Moot #4 Motion to Proceed IFP; ORDER VACATING #5 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER DIRECTING to Issue the Summons and New Case Documents in this matter, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/17/2021. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 14, 2021 Opinion or Order PAYMENT for Civil Case filing fee in the amount of $ 402, receipt number 0972-9603065. (Pena, Jonathan)
May 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS recommending that Plaintiff's application to proceed without prepayment of fees be denied and Plaintiff be ordered to pay the $402.00 filing fee in this action ;referred to Judge Unassigned DJ; new case number 1:21-cv-00680 NONE-SAB (SS), signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 05/5/2021. (Objections to F&R due within 14-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
May 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Maria Juarez. (Pena, Jonathan)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP without Prejudice and Requiring Plaintiff to File Long Form Application signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 04/23/2021. Motion for IFP due within Twenty-Days. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application Long Form)(Flores, E)
April 23, 2021 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Lundstrom, T)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Maria Juarez. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Pena, Jonathan)
April 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 SOCIAL SECURITY COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Maria Juarez. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Pena, Jonathan)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Juarez v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Maria Juarez
Represented By: Jonathan Omar Pena
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?