Henderson v. Hamilton et al
Plaintiff: Dae Henderson, Jr.
Defendant: Patrick Eaton, Jeffrey Y. Hamilton and Smittencamp
Case Number: 1:2021cv00697
Filed: April 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Civil Rights: Other
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 19, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 ORDER to SHOW CAUSE why the action should not be Dismissed for Plaintiff's Failure to Comply with the Court's Order, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 06/14/2021. (Show Cause Response due within 21-Day Deadline)(Martin-Gill, S)
June 14, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #4 Order to Show Cause served on Dae Henderson Jr.. (Martin-Gill, S)
May 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER DENYING without Prejudice #2 Application to Proceed without the Prepayment of Fees and REQUIRING Plaintiff to File an Amended Application within Thirty Days signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 5/3/2021. (Attachments: #1 IFP Application)(Sant Agata, S)
May 3, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Order, served on Dae Henderson Jr.. (Sant Agata, S)
April 28, 2021 Filing 2 Notice of Surety Bond and MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Dae Henderson, Jr. (Sant Agata, S)
April 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Dae Henderson, Jr.(Sant Agata, S)
April 28, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Sant Agata, S)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Henderson v. Hamilton et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Patrick Eaton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jeffrey Y. Hamilton
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Smittencamp
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Dae Henderson, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?