Walker v. Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri et al
Plaintiff: Melissa Lois Walker
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC, Trans Union, LLC, Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri Doing business as MOHELA and Action Financial Services, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv00879
Filed: June 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Referring Judge: Dale A Drozd
Nature of Suit: Consumer Credit
Cause of Action: 15 U.S.C. ยง 1681
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on May 9, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 23, 2021 Filing 22 ANSWER by Equifax Information Services, LLC.(Quinn, Thomas)
July 19, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR HIGHER EDUCATION LOAN AUTHORITY OF THE STATE OF MISSOURI TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. DEADLINE: AUGUST 2, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 7/19/2021(Hernandez, M)
July 16, 2021 Filing 20 STIPULATION and PROPOSED ORDER for Extending Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint re #1 Complaint, by Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order Re Second Stipulation to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint)(Sosnicki, Lukas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 19 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Action Financial Services, LLC. (Goodman, Brett)
June 25, 2021 Filing 18 ANSWER by Action Financial Services, LLC. Attorney Goodman, Brett Brandon added.(Goodman, Brett)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EQUIFAX INFORMATION SYSTEMS LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. DEADLINE: JULY 23, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/25/2021(Hernandez, M)
June 25, 2021 Filing 16 STIPULATION re #1 Complaint, to Extend Defendant's Time to Respond to Complaint by Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri. Attorney Sosnicki, Lukas added. (Sosnicki, Lukas)
June 25, 2021 Filing 15 ANSWER by Trans Union, LLC.(Nicodemus, Camille)
June 24, 2021 Filing 14 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Equifax Information Services, LLC. (Quinn, Thomas)
June 24, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend time to respond to Complaint by Equifax Information Services, LLC. Attorney Quinn, Thomas P. added. (Quinn, Thomas)
June 15, 2021 Filing 12 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri served on 6/7/2021, answer due 6/28/2021. (Veggian, Lauren)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 ORDER GRANTING #9 Camille R. Nicodemus, Attorney for Trans Union, LLC's Pro Hac Vice Application, signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/11/2021. (Maldonado, C)
June 11, 2021 Filing 10 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Trans Union, LLC. (Booth, Eileen)
June 11, 2021 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Trans Union, LLC for attorney Camille R. Nicodemus to appear Pro Hac Vice. Attorney Booth, Eileen T. added. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9647708) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit 1, #2 Exhibit 2)(Booth, Eileen)
June 9, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Action Financial Services, LLC served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Veggian, Lauren)
June 9, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Trans Union, LLC served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Veggian, Lauren)
June 9, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Equifax Information Services, LLC served on 6/4/2021, answer due 6/25/2021. (Veggian, Lauren)
June 3, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/31/2021 at 11:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
June 3, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri, Trans Union, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lauren B. Veggian* *The Cardoza Law Corporation* *548 Market St. #80594* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Maldonado, C)
June 3, 2021 Filing 3 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Action Financial Services, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Lauren B. Veggian* *The Cardoza Law Corporation* *548 Market St. #80594* *San Francisco, CA 94104*. (Maldonado, C)
June 2, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Melissa Lois Walker (Veggian, Lauren)
June 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT for Damages against Action Financial Services, LLC, Equifax Information Services, LLC, Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri, Trans Union, LLC by Melissa Lois Walker. Attorney Veggian, Lauren Brooks added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9633807) (Veggian, Lauren)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Walker v. Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Equifax Information Services, LLC
Represented By: Thomas P. Quinn, Jr.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Trans Union, LLC
Represented By: Eileen T. Booth
Represented By: Camille R. Nicodemus, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Higher Education Loan Authority of the State of Missouri Doing business as MOHELA
Represented By: Lukas Sosnicki
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Action Financial Services, LLC
Represented By: Brett Brandon Goodman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Melissa Lois Walker
Represented By: Lauren Brooks Veggian
Represented By: Michael Frederick Cardoza
Represented By: Ryan Lee McBride
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?