Elliott v. Elliott et al
Plaintiff: Aaron A Elliott and Aaron A. Elliott
Defendant: Brian Johnson, Frank T. Elliott, III and Wileman Bros. & Elliott Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv00897
Filed: June 4, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 17, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 26, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 23 WITHDRAWAL of #10 Motion to Remand,, filed by Aaron A. Elliott. (Seymour, Christopher)
July 23, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 22 CONSENT ORDER REASSIGNING CASE for all purposes to Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 07/23/2021. (Flores, E)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 21 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Quall, Matthew)
July 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 20 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Seymour, Christopher)
July 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 19 OPPOSITION by Frank T. Elliott, III, Brian Johnson, Wileman Bros. & Elliott Inc. to #10 Motion to Remand,,. (Attachments: #1 Request for Judicial Notice)(Dardenne, Matthew)
July 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 18 ANSWER by Aaron A. Elliott. (Attachments: #1 Proof of Service Certificate of Service)(Seymour, Christopher)
July 9, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 17 ANSWER by Frank T. Elliott, III, Brian Johnson, Wileman Bros. & Elliott Inc..(Dardenne, Matthew)
July 8, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 REPLY by Frank T. Elliott, III, Brian Johnson, Wileman Bros. & Elliott Inc. re #6 Motion to Dismiss,. (Dardenne, Matthew)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 OBJECTIONS by Plaintiff Aaron A. Elliott to #6 MOTION to DISMISS. (Seymour, Christopher)
June 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 14 OPPOSITION by Aaron A. Elliott to #6 Motion to Dismiss,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration Declaration of Christopher E. Seymour)(Seymour, Christopher)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 13 ORDER RE STIPULATION TO EXTEND TIME FOR EQUIFAX INFORMATION SYSTEMS LLC TO RESPOND TO COMPLAINT. DEADLINE: JULY 15, 2021. Signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/29/2021(Hernandez, M)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/29/2021: (Text Only Entry). Due to the pending Motion to Remand the Scheduling Conference is reset from 8/17/2021 to 2/15/2022 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. A Joint Scheduling Conference statement is due one week before the new conference date. (Hernandez, M)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 STIPULATION re #7 Answer to Complaint, Counterclaim Extension of Time to Respond by Aaron A. Elliott. (Seymour, Christopher)
June 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MOTION to REMAND Case to State Court by Aaron A. Elliott. Motion Hearing set for 8/3/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Memo of P & A's In Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #2 Declaration Declaration of C. Seymour in Support of Motion to Remand Case to State Court, #3 Exhibit Exhibit 1 to Declaration of C. Seymour, #4 Exhibit Exhibit 2 to Declaration of C. Seymour, #5 Exhibit Exhibit 3 to Declaration of C. Seymour, #6 Exhibit Exhibit 4 to Declaration of C. Seymour, #7 Exhibit Exhibit 5 to Declaration of C. Seymour)(Seymour, Christopher)
June 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 FIRST AMENDED COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Aaron A. Elliott.(Seymour, Christopher)
June 15, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are informed that pursuant to Local Rule 302 and the Standing Order Re Judicial Emergency [3-2], the recently-filed motion to dismiss #6 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. No hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. The hearing date chosen by the filing party serves only to set the opposition and reply filing deadlines. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of the Court's extraordinarily heavy caseload signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on June 15, 2021. (Munoz, I)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ANSWER, COUNTERCLAIM against Aaron A. Elliott by Brian Johnson, Wileman Bros. & Elliott Inc., Frank T. Elliott, III. by Brian Johnson, Wileman Bros. & Elliott Inc., Frank T. Elliott, III.(Quall, Matthew)
June 14, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Frank T. Elliott, III, Brian Johnson, Wileman Bros. & Elliott Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 7/14/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities, #2 Declaration, #3 Request for Judicial Notice, #4 Proof of Service)(Quall, Matthew)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER REQUIRING DEFENDANTS TO FILE RESPONSIVE PLEADING. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that Defendants shall file a responsive pleading within seven (7) days of the date of entry of this order. Order signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 6/7/2021. (Apodaca, P)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Frank T. Elliott, III, Brian Johnson, Wileman Bros. & Elliott Inc. (Quall, Matthew)
June 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 8/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 9 (SAB) before Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Matthew W. Quall: Under Local Rule 200, every complaint, amended complaint, or other document initiating a civil action shall be accompanied by a completed civil cover sheet, on a form available from the Clerk and on the Court's website. Please file your civil cover sheet. If you need assistance, please contact the CM/ECF help desk at 866-884-5444, or refer to the CM/ECF User's Manual on the court's website. (Marrujo, C)
June 4, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Tulare County Superior Court, case number VPR050531 by Aaron A Elliott. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9637903) (Quall, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Elliott v. Elliott et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Brian Johnson
Represented By: John M. Cardot
Represented By: Matthew W. Quall
Represented By: Matthew R. Dardenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Frank T. Elliott, III
Represented By: John M. Cardot
Represented By: Matthew W. Quall
Represented By: Matthew R. Dardenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wileman Bros. & Elliott Inc.
Represented By: John M. Cardot
Represented By: Matthew W. Quall
Represented By: Matthew R. Dardenne
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron A Elliott
Represented By: David Malcolm Gilmore
Represented By: Christopher E. Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aaron A. Elliott
Represented By: David Malcolm Gilmore
Represented By: Christopher E. Seymour
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?