AmeriPride Services, LLC et al v. Teamsters Local 87 et al
Plaintiff: AmeriPride Services, LLC and Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC
Defendant: Teamsters Local 431, Teamsters Local 87, Teamsters Local 137 and Teamsters Local 386
Case Number: 1:2021cv00969
Filed: June 18, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 29 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 30, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 20, 2021 Filing 13 NOTICE of RELATED CASE(S) 1:21-cv-01102 by Teamsters Local 137, Teamsters Local 386, Teamsters Local 431, Teamsters Local 87. Attorney McEntee, Peter Mainland added. (McEntee, Peter)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2021. Added attorney Phillip A. Miscimarra, PHV for AmeriPride Services, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. Application #9 is Granted. (Jessen, A)
June 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 PRO HAC VICE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 6/29/2021. Added attorney Lauren Michelle Emery, PHV for AmeriPride Services, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. Application #8 is Granted. (Jessen, A)
June 29, 2021 Filing 10 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by AmeriPride Services, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Gerber, Seth)
June 29, 2021 Filing 9 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by AmeriPride Services, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC for attorney Philip A. Miscimarra to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9675418) (Gerber, Seth)
June 29, 2021 Filing 8 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by AmeriPride Services, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC for attorney Lauren Michelle Emery to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number 0972-9675396) (Gerber, Seth)
June 25, 2021 Filing 7 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to All Defendants (Gerber, Seth)
June 21, 2021 Filing 6 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/23/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
June 21, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Teamsters Local 431, Teamsters Local 87* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP* *Seth M. Gerber* *2049 Century Park East, Suite 700* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Maldonado, C)
June 21, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Teamsters Local 137, Teamsters Local 386* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Morgan, Lewis & Bockius LLP* *Seth M. Gerber* *2049 Century Park East, Suite 700* *Los Angeles, CA 90067*. (Maldonado, C)
June 18, 2021 Filing 3 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiffs AmeriPride Services, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Gerber, Seth)
June 18, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by AmeriPride Services, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC (Gerber, Seth)
June 18, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Plaintiffs by AmeriPride Services, LLC, Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9659014) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Exh A - AUCA v Tmstrs (Fresno CBA), #2 Exhibit Exh B - AUCA v Tmstrs (1st Fresno Extnsn), #3 Exhibit Exh C - AUCA v Tmstrs (2nd Fresno Extnsn), #4 Exhibit Exh D - AUCA v Tmstrs (Fresno 431 Grv), #5 Exhibit Exh E - AUCA v Tmstrs (Merced CBA), #6 Exhibit Exh F - AUCA v Tmstrs (Merced Extnsn), #7 Exhibit Exh G - AUCA v Tmstrs (Merced 386 Grv), #8 Exhibit Exh H - AUCA v Tmstrs (Redding CBA), #9 Exhibit Exh I - AUCA v Tmstrs (Redding Extnsn), #10 Exhibit Exh J - AUCA v Tmstrs (Redding 137 Grv), #11 Exhibit Exh K - AUCA v Tmstrs (Bakersfield CBA), #12 Exhibit Exh L - AUCA v Tmstrs (Bakersfield 87 Grv))(Gerber, Seth)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: AmeriPride Services, LLC et al v. Teamsters Local 87 et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: AmeriPride Services, LLC
Represented By: Seth M. Gerber
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Emery, PHV
Represented By: Phillip A. Miscimarra, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aramark Uniform & Career Apparel, LLC
Represented By: Seth M. Gerber
Represented By: Lauren Michelle Emery, PHV
Represented By: Phillip A. Miscimarra, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 431
Represented By: Peter Mainland McEntee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 87
Represented By: Peter Mainland McEntee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 137
Represented By: Peter Mainland McEntee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Teamsters Local 386
Represented By: Peter Mainland McEntee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?