Produce Pay, Inc. v. Terra Bella LLC
Plaintiff: Produce Pay, Inc.
Defendant: Terra Bella LLC and Jesus Gonzalez
Case Number: 1:2021cv00980
Filed: June 21, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Agriculture Acts
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 13, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 18, 2021 Filing 7 ANSWER by Jesus Gonzalez, Terra Bella LLC. Attorney Dake, Stephen Michael added.(Dake, Stephen)
July 21, 2021 Filing 6 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Plaintiff Produce Pay, Inc.. (Kane, Patrick)
June 30, 2021 Filing 5 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Jesus Gonzalez on 6/23/2021, Answer due 8/23/2021 (Kane, Patrick)
June 30, 2021 Filing 4 WAIVER of SERVICE RETURNED EXECUTED: Waiver sent to Terra Bella LLC on 6/23/2021, Answer due 8/23/2021 (Kane, Patrick)
June 21, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/17/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Worksheet, #2 Consent Form, #3 VDRP) (Lundstrom, T)
June 21, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Jesus Gonzalez, Terra Bella LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Patrick Jeffrey Kane* *Maurice Wutscher LLP* *501 West Broadway, Suite 800* *San Diego, CA 92101*. (Lundstrom, T)
June 21, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Produce Pay, Inc.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9660376) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exs A-I)(Kane, Patrick)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Produce Pay, Inc. v. Terra Bella LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Produce Pay, Inc.
Represented By: Patrick Jeffrey Kane
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Terra Bella LLC
Represented By: Stephen Michael Dake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Jesus Gonzalez
Represented By: Stephen Michael Dake
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?