(SS) Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Terry Wayne Williams
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv01000
Filed: June 24, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Stanley A Boone
Nature of Suit: Social Security: DIWC/DIWW
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 1, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
July 12, 2021 Filing 5 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Lambert, Meghan)
June 25, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Meghan O. Lambert* *Osterhout Berger Disability Law* *521 Cedar Way, Suite 200* *Oakmont, PA 15139*. (Flores, E)
June 25, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP signed by Magistrate Judge Stanley A. Boone on 06/25/2021. Documents served on Commissioner and USAO as directed. (Flores, E)
June 24, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Terry Wayne Williams. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Lambert, Meghan)
June 24, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Terry Wayne Williams. Attorney Lambert, Meghan O. added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Lambert, Meghan)
June 24, 2021 APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Flores, E)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Williams v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Terry Wayne Williams
Represented By: Meghan O. Lambert
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?