Noyer v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Plaintiff: Jack B. Noyer
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01024
Filed: June 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Real Property: Foreclosure
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 10, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 10, 2021 Filing 9 REPLY by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #6 Motion to Dismiss, #8 Opposition to Motion. (Shulman, Jeremy)
July 30, 2021 Filing 8 OPPOSITION by Jack B. Noyer to #6 Motion to Dismiss. (Redman, Courtney)
July 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 7/7/2021: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c). (Thorp, J)
July 6, 2021 Filing 6 MOTION to DISMISS by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. Motion Hearing set for 8/17/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Proposed Order)(Shulman, Jeremy)
June 29, 2021 Filing 5 CERTIFICATE of SERVICE by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A. re #3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD,. (Shulman, Jeremy)
June 29, 2021 Filing 4 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Courtney W. Redman: In order to practice in this court, you must be admitted to practice in this district. Please fill out and submit the attached Petition for Attorney Admission along with the $200.00 fee. (Marrujo, C)
June 29, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 9/22/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Worksheet, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
June 29, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #3 Civil New Case Documents for DAD, #4 Docket Annotation, served on Courtney W. Redman, NCAED. (Marrujo, C)
June 28, 2021 Filing 2 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Shulman, Jeremy)
June 28, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-21-101158 by Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number 0972-9673894) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Jeremy Shulman)(Shulman, Jeremy)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Noyer v. Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jack B. Noyer
Represented By: Courtney W. Redman, NCAED
Represented By: Courtney W. Redman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Wells Fargo Bank, N.A.
Represented By: Jeremy E. Shulman
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?