Pottier et al v. United States of America et al
Plaintiff: Marie-Pierre Pottier, Jean-Philippe Pottier, Elodie Pottier, Loann Pottier, Charlene Pottier, Guillaume Pottier and Marc Moreau
Defendant: United States of America and United States Department of the Navy
Case Number: 1:2021cv01138
Filed: July 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Anthony W Ishii
Referring Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Airplane
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 2271
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on August 20, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
August 20, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: United States Department of the Navy served on 8/12/2021, answer due 9/2/2021. (Angarella, Steven)
August 19, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: United States of America served on 8/10/2021, answer due 8/31/2021. (Angarella, Steven)
July 28, 2021 Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 10/27/2021 at 08:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. (Attachments: #1 Order re Consent, #2 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
July 28, 2021 Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *United States Department of the Navy, United States of America* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Steven Vincent Angarella* *12121 Wilshire Blvd.* *Suite 1103* *Los Angeles, CA 90025*. (Sant Agata, S)
July 28, 2021 Filing 3 MOTION to APPOINT GUARDIAN AD LITEM by Marie-Pierre Pottier. (Angarella, Steven)
July 28, 2021 Filing 2 CLERK'S NOTICE to Steven Vincent Angarella: Please re-file your Application for Appointment of Guardian ad Litem as a separate entry using the event, Motion to Appoint Guardian ad Litem, which can be found under the category Motions and Related Filings, Motions. (Jessen, A)
July 28, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against United States Department of the Navy, United States of America by Guillaume Pottier, Elodie Pottier, Marc Moreau, Jean-Philippe Pottier, Loann Pottier, Marie-Pierre Pottier, Charlene Pottier. Attorney Angarella, Steven Vincent added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9733646) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet Civil cover sheet, #2 Application and Proposed Order for Appointment of Guardian Ad Litem -Civil- By Applicant Marie-Pierre Pottier for Elodie Pottier, a minor)(Angarella, Steven)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Pottier et al v. United States of America et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marie-Pierre Pottier
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Bregman
Represented By: Steven Vincent Angarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Jean-Philippe Pottier
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Bregman
Represented By: Steven Vincent Angarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Elodie Pottier
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Bregman
Represented By: Steven Vincent Angarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Loann Pottier
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Bregman
Represented By: Steven Vincent Angarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Charlene Pottier
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Bregman
Represented By: Steven Vincent Angarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Guillaume Pottier
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Bregman
Represented By: Steven Vincent Angarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Marc Moreau
Represented By: Aaron Samuel Bregman
Represented By: Steven Vincent Angarella
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States of America
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: United States Department of the Navy
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?