(PC) Allen v. Dean et al
Plaintiff: James D. Allen and Llord J.P. Allen
Defendant: Rashuan Q. Dean, Gracian, T. Plumlee, L. Stephens, B. Davis, M. Garcia, B. Cates and K. Allison
Case Number: 1:2021cv01150
Filed: July 29, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Prisoner: Civil Rights
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on February 17, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 ORDER ADOPTING #8 Findings and Recommendations; ORDER REQUIRING Plaintiff to Pay Filing Fee in Full within Forty-Five Days signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 9/17/2021. (Sant Agata, S)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #10 Order Adopting Findings and Recommendations, served on James D. Allen. (Sant Agata, S)
September 20, 2021 Opinion or Order RECEIPT number #CAE100049090 $402.00 fbo James D Allen V69177 by State of California on 9/10/2021. (Maldonado, C)
September 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Flores, E)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 FINDINGS and RECOMMENDATIONS Recommending that Plaintiff's Application to Proceed In Forma Pauperis be Denied, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/03/2021. Referred to Judge Unassigned DJ. Objections to F&R Due Within Twenty-One Days. (Maldonado, C)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STANDING ORDER AND CLERK'S NOTICE REASSIGNING CASE. This case has been assigned to UnassignedDJ and Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. The new case number is: 1:21-CV-01150-NONE-EPG. (Maldonado, C)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 ORDER DENYING #5 Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Pro Bono Counsel, Without Prejudice, signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 08/03/2021. (Maldonado, C)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Clerk's Notice Reassigning Case, #8 Findings and Recommendations served on James D. Allen. (Maldonado, C)
August 3, 2021 Opinion or Order SERVICE BY MAIL: #6 Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel served on James D. Allen. (Maldonado, C)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 MOTION to APPOINT COUNSEL by James D. Allen. (Maldonado, C)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DOCUMENT(S) SERVED ELECTRONICALLY: #3 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on CCI. (Maldonado, C)
July 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; E-Filing Notice issued re complaint filed *7/29/2021*;Plaintiff's Consent or Decline due by 9/2/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form, #2 E-Filing Notice) (Maldonado, C)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by James D. Allen. (Maldonado, C)
July 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 (1983) PRISONER CIVIL RIGHTS COMPLAINT against K. Allison, B. Cates, B. Davis, Rashuan Q. Dean, M. Garcia, Gracian, T. Plumlee, L. Stephens by James D. Allen. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Maldonado, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Allen v. Dean et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: James D. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Llord J.P. Allen
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Rashuan Q. Dean
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Gracian
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: T. Plumlee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: L. Stephens
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Davis
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M. Garcia
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: B. Cates
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: K. Allison
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?