Teamsters Local 386 v. Longs Drug Stores California, LLC
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 386
Defendant: Longs Drug Stores California, LLC Doing business as CVS/Pharmacy
Case Number: 1:2021cv01174
Filed: August 2, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Erica P Grosjean
Nature of Suit: Labor: Labor/Mgt. Relations
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 185
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on December 6, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 8, 2021 Filing 7 NOTICE OF INTERESTED PARTIES by Longs Drug Stores California, LLC. (Fears, Daniel)
September 8, 2021 Filing 6 ANSWER by Longs Drug Stores California, LLC. Attorney Fears, Daniel F. added.(Fears, Daniel)
August 23, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Teamsters Local 386 served on 8/18/2021, answer due 9/8/2021. (McEntee, Peter)
August 10, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 MINUTE ORDER signed by Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean on 8/10/2021: To accommodate the Court's calendar, the Initial Scheduling Conference currently set for 11/9/2021 is CONTINUED and will now be held on 12/13/2021 at 10:00 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. To appear telephonically, each party is directed to use the following dial-in number and passcode: 1-888-251-2909; passcode 1024453. The parties are also reminded to file a joint scheduling report one full week prior to the conference and email a copy of same, in Word format, to epgorders@caed.uscourts.gov, for the Judge's review. (Rooney, M)
August 3, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/9/2021 at 10:30 AM in Courtroom 10 (EPG) before Magistrate Judge Erica P. Grosjean. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Marrujo, C)
August 3, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Longs Drug Stores California, LLC* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Peter Mainland McEntee* *Beeson, Tayer & Bodine, APC* *520 Capitol Mall, Suite 300* *Sacramento, CA 95814*. (Marrujo, C)
August 2, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT to Compel Arbitration or, in the Alternative, Complaint for Breach of Collective Bargaining Agreement against Longs Drug Stores California, LLC d/b/a/ CVS/Pharmacy by Teamsters Local 386. Attorney McEntee, Peter Mainland added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9741936) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Exhibit A, #3 Exhibit B, #4 Exhibit C, #5 Exhibit D)(McEntee, Peter)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Teamsters Local 386 v. Longs Drug Stores California, LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Teamsters Local 386
Represented By: Peter Mainland McEntee
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Longs Drug Stores California, LLC Doing business as CVS/Pharmacy
Represented By: Daniel F. Fears
Represented By: Andrew Keith Haeffele
Represented By: Tyler Brian Runge
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?