Height Street Skilled Care, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Plaintiff: Height Street Skilled Care, LLC
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company and Young & Associates, Inc.
Case Number: 1:2021cv01247
Filed: August 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Insurance
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on July 29, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 12, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 12 REPLY by Young & Associates, Inc. re #9 Motion to Dismiss, #11 Opposition to Motion. (Israel, Mark)
October 5, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 11 OPPOSITION by Height Street Skilled Care, LLC to #9 Motion to Dismiss,. (Scott, Peter)
September 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry) The parties are informed that pursuant to Local Rule 302 and the Standing Order Re Judicial Emergency [5-3], the recently-filed motion to dismiss #9 will be heard and decided by the undersigned. No hearing will be calendared, and the matter will be decided on the papers. The hearing date chosen by the filing party serves only to set the opposition and reply filing deadlines. A written decision will issue as soon as is practicable in light of the Court's extraordinarily heavy caseload signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on September 24, 2021. (Munoz, I)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MOTION to DISMISS by Young & Associates, Inc.. Motion Hearing set for 10/19/2021 at 09:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Points and Authorities Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Motion to Dismiss, #2 Declaration Declaration of Mark R. Israel in Support of Motion to Dismiss)(Israel, Mark)
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 8 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Peter D. Scott on behalf of Height Street Skilled Care, LLC. Attorney Scott, Peter D. added. (Scott, Peter)
September 7, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 STIPULATION Re Extension Of Time For Defendant R.L. Young, LLC To Respond To Plaintiff's Complaint by Young & Associates, Inc.. (Israel, Mark)
August 27, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 NOTICE OF JOINDER AND CONSENT TO REMOVAL by Young & Associates, Inc. re #1 Notice of Removal. Attorney Israel, Mark added. (Israel, Mark)
August 17, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/16/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Maldonado, C)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 DEMAND for TRIAL by JURY by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company. (Lau, Norman)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 DECLARATION of Norman Lau re #1 Notice of Removal. (Lau, Norman)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by Liberty Mutual Insurance Company (Lau, Norman)
August 16, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Superior Court of Kern County, case number BCV-21-100925 by Height Street Skilled Care, LLC. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9766185) (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Interested Parties)(Lau, Norman)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Height Street Skilled Care, LLC v. Liberty Mutual Insurance Company et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Height Street Skilled Care, LLC
Represented By: Eric Peter Early
Represented By: Peter D. Scott
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Liberty Mutual Insurance Company
Represented By: Nicholas J. Boos
Represented By: Norman Lau
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Young & Associates, Inc.
Represented By: Mark Israel
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?