General Insurance Company of America v. Whirlpool Corporation
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Case Number: 1:2021cv01306
Filed: August 27, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1446
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 18, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 28, 2021 Filing 7 CLERK'S NOTICE to Attorney Jennifer Millier re #6 Notice of Change of Address: Due tothe recent upgrade in the Eastern District of California to NextGen, all changes to address will need to be made through Pacer. Until you update your address through Pacer, the docket will reflect your previous address. (Sant Agata, S)
September 27, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Jennifer Marie Millier. (Millier, Jennifer)
September 2, 2021 Filing 5 CORPORATE DISCLOSURE STATEMENT by Defendant Whirlpool Corporation. (Millier, Jennifer)
September 2, 2021 Filing 4 ANSWER with Jury Demand by Whirlpool Corporation.(Millier, Jennifer)
August 30, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 11/18/2021 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 JLT Worksheet, #2 Standing Order, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
August 27, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL COVER SHEET by WHIRLPOOL CORPORATION (Millier, Jennifer)
August 27, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court of California, case number BCV-21-101709 by GENERAL INSURANCE COMPANY OF AMERICA as subrogee of its insured Brent Newby. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9790487) (Millier, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: General Insurance Company of America v. Whirlpool Corporation
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: General Insurance Company of America
Represented By: Sally Noma
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Whirlpool Corporation
Represented By: Jennifer Marie Millier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?