Aileen Brooks v. It Works Marketing, Inc. et al
Plaintiff: Aileen Brooks
Defendant: It Works Marketing, Inc., It Works! Global, Inc., Mark Pentecost and Paul Nassif
Case Number: 1:2021cv01341
Filed: September 3, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Dale A Drozd
Referring Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Other Fraud
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332
Jury Demanded By: Plaintiff
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 10/28/2021: In light of the pending motion to compel arbitration, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2021 is CONTINUED to 3/8/2022 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint report at least one week prior to the conference. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 15 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 10/28/2021: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c).(Hernandez, M)
October 27, 2021 Filing 14 MOTION to COMPEL Arbitration by It Works Marketing, Inc., It Works! Global, Inc., Paul Nassif, Mark Pentecost. Motion Hearing set for 12/7/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum of Law in Support of Defendant's Motion to Compel Arbitration, #2 Declaration of Tracy O. Zinsou, #3 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Tracy O. Zinsou, #4 Declaration of Timothy Seat, #5 Exhibit 1 to Declaration of Timothy Seat, #6 Exhibit 2 to Declaration of Timothy Seat, #7 Proposed Order)(Zinsou, Tracy)
September 28, 2021 Filing 13 STIPULATION to Extend Time to Answer or Respond to Complaint by It Works Marketing, Inc., It Works! Global, Inc., Paul Nassif, Mark Pentecost. (Kwasniewski, David)
September 28, 2021 Filing 12 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Tracy O. Zinsou on behalf of It Works Marketing, Inc., It Works! Global, Inc., Paul Nassif, Mark Pentecost. Attorney Zinsou, Tracy O. added. (Zinsou, Tracy)
September 28, 2021 Filing 11 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by David Howard Kwasniewski on behalf of It Works Marketing, Inc., It Works! Global, Inc., Paul Nassif, Mark Pentecost. Attorney Kwasniewski, David Howard added. (Kwasniewski, David)
September 28, 2021 Filing 10 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by J. Noah Hagey on behalf of It Works Marketing, Inc., It Works! Global, Inc., Paul Nassif, Mark Pentecost. Attorney Hagey, J. Noah added. (Hagey, J.)
September 28, 2021 Filing 9 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Matthew Borden on behalf of It Works Marketing, Inc., It Works! Global, Inc., Paul Nassif, Mark Pentecost. Attorney Borden, Matthew added. (Borden, Matthew)
September 16, 2021 Filing 8 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Paul Nassif served on 9/14/2021, answer due 10/5/2021. (Weston, Gregory)
September 14, 2021 Filing 7 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: It Works! Global, Inc. served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Weston, Gregory)
September 14, 2021 Filing 6 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: It Works Marketing, Inc. served on 9/10/2021, answer due 10/1/2021. (Weston, Gregory)
September 8, 2021 Filing 5 SUMMONS RETURNED EXECUTED: Mark Pentecost served on 9/8/2021, answer due 9/29/2021. (Weston, Gregory)
September 8, 2021 Filing 4 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Weston, Gregory)
September 8, 2021 Filing 3 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/13/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 8, 2021 Filing 2 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *It Works Marketing, Inc., It Works! Global, Inc., Paul Nassif, Mark Pentecost* with answer to complaint due within *21* days. Attorney *Gregory Steven Weston* *The Weston Firm* *1405 Morena Boulevard, Suite 201* *San Diego, CA 92110*. (Martin-Gill, S)
September 3, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants by Aileen Brooks. Attorney Weston, Gregory Steven added. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9802626) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Weston, Gregory)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Aileen Brooks v. It Works Marketing, Inc. et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Aileen Brooks
Represented By: Gregory Steven Weston
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: It Works Marketing, Inc.
Represented By: David Howard Kwasniewski
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Tracy O. Zinsou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: It Works! Global, Inc.
Represented By: David Howard Kwasniewski
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Tracy O. Zinsou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Mark Pentecost
Represented By: David Howard Kwasniewski
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Tracy O. Zinsou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Paul Nassif
Represented By: David Howard Kwasniewski
Represented By: J. Noah Hagey
Represented By: Matthew Borden
Represented By: Tracy O. Zinsou
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?