(PC) Lazier v. Coalinga State Hospital, et al.
Plaintiff: Theodore R Lazier
Defendant: Coalinga State Hospital, M Lidcey and Department of Police Services
Case Number: 1:2021cv01362
Filed: September 13, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Office: Fresno Office
Presiding Judge: Barbara A McAuliffe
Nature of Suit: Prison Conditions
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 1983
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on September 15, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
September 13, 2021 Filing 7 PRISONER NEW CASE DOCUMENTS and ORDER RE CONSENT ISSUED; Consent or Decline due by 10/18/2021. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Lundstrom, T)
September 13, 2021 Filing 6 CASE TRANSFERRED IN from District of Florida Northern; Case Number 5:21-cv-00163.
September 13, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER adopting #4 Report and Recommendation. This case is TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The Clerk shall terminate all pending motions and close the case file in this Court. Signed by JUDGE T KENT WETHERELL II on 9/13/2021. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 9/13/2021.]
September 13, 2021 SERVICE BY MAIL: #7 Prisoner New Case Documents for Magistrate Judge as Presider served on Theodore R Lazier. (Lundstrom, T)
August 17, 2021 Filing 4 REPORT AND RECOMMENDATION re #1 Complaint. For the reasons set forth above, the undersigned respectfully RECOMMENDS: This case be TRANSFERRED to the United States District Court for the Eastern District of California. The clerk of the court close this file. (Internal deadline for referral to district judge if objections are not filed earlier: 9/14/2021.) Signed by MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK on 8/17/2021. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 9/13/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 3 Notice to Pro Se (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 9/13/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis by THEODORE R LAZIER. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 9/13/2021.]
August 12, 2021 Filing 1 COMPLAINT against All Defendants, filed by THEODORE R LAZIER. (Filing fee was not paid. No service copies filed.) (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 9/13/2021.]
August 12, 2021 ACTION REQUIRED BY MAGISTRATE JUDGE: Chambers of MAGISTRATE JUDGE MICHAEL J FRANK notified that action is needed Re: #2 MOTION for Leave to Proceed in forma pauperis, #1 Complaint. Referred to MICHAEL J FRANK. (jcw) [Transferred from flnd on 9/13/2021.]

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (PC) Lazier v. Coalinga State Hospital, et al.
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Theodore R Lazier
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Coalinga State Hospital
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: M Lidcey
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Department of Police Services
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?