Eugene Griffith et al v. FCA US LLC
Plaintiff: Eugene Griffith and Frances Griffith
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01381
Filed: September 15, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Helena M Barch-Kuchta
Nature of Suit: Prop. Damage Prod. Liability
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1331
Jury Demanded By: Both
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on October 28, 2021. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER OF CLARIFICATION re district judge availability to hear matters in the Eastern District of California. (Jessen, A)
October 22, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 TEXT ONLY ORDER APPROVING #3 Defendant's substitution of counsel pursuant to Local Rule 182(g). Jon Universal shall replace Matthew M. Proudfoot as counsel of record for Defendant FCA US LLC. Signed by Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta on 10/22/2021. (Adams, E)
October 21, 2021 Filing 3 REQUEST for Substitution of Attorney by FCA US LLC. (Proudfoot, Matthew)
September 16, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED: Initial Scheduling Conference set for 5/19/2021 at 11:30 AM in Courtroom 6 (HBK) before Magistrate Judge Helena M. Barch-Kuchta. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #3 Consent Form, #4 VDRP) (Martin-Gill, S)
September 15, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Fresno, case number 21CECG02224 by Eugene Griffith, Frances Griffith. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9819704) (Attachments: #1 Summons & Complaint - State Court, #2 Answer to Complaint - State Court, #3 Civil Cover Sheet, #4 Notice of Appearance, #5 Notice Of Interested Parties, #6 Declaration of M. Proudfoot ISO Notice of Removal)(Proudfoot, Matthew)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Eugene Griffith et al v. FCA US LLC
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Eugene Griffith
Represented By: David N. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Frances Griffith
Represented By: David N. Barry
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Matthew Millard Proudfoot
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?