Massey v. FCA US LLC, et al
Plaintiff: Ingrid C. Massey
Defendant: FCA US LLC, CJM Automotive Group, Inc. Doing business as Bakersfield Chrysler Jeep Fiat and FCA US, LLC
Case Number: 1:2021cv01392
Filed: September 16, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: BakersfieldMJ
Referring Judge: Ana de Alba
2 Judge: Christopher D Baker
3 Judge: Dale A Drozd
4 Judge: Jennifer L Thurston
Nature of Suit: Contract: Other
Cause of Action: 28 U.S.C. ยง 1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Jury Demanded By: Defendant
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on January 12, 2023. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
January 12, 2023 Opinion or Order Filing 38 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry), signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 1/12/2023: Due to the pending motion to remand, along with the ongoing judicial emergency and heavy caseload experienced by this district, the Scheduling Conference set for 2/2/2023 is CONTINUED to 5/3/2023 at 09:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely via Zoom video conference, and counsel may obtain the Zoom ID and password from the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. A joint scheduling conference statement shall be filed in compliance with the procedures set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (Doc. #2 ). (Hall, S)
October 14, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 37 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only Entry), signed by Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker on 10/14/2022: Due to the pending motion to remand, along with the ongoing judicial emergency and heavy caseload experienced by this district, the Scheduling Conference currently set for 10/27/2022 at 9:00 AM before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe is CONTINUED to 2/2/2023 at 09:00 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker. The parties shall appear at the conference remotely via Zoom video conference, and the Zoom ID and password will be provided to counsel by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint report at least one week prior to the conference and the report shall also be e-mailed, in Word format, to CDBorders@caed.uscourts.gov. (Hall, S)
October 6, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 36 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker to the bench of the Eastern District of California, the court hereby reassigns this case from Bakersfield Magistrate Judge (BAK) to Magistrate Judge Christopher D. Baker for all further proceedings. (Lundstrom, T)
September 16, 2022 Filing 35 FIRST AMENDED STATUS REPORT by Ingrid C. Massey. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
September 16, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 34 MINUTE ORDER (Text Only): The Court has reviewed the parties' joint status report. (Doc. #33 .) Since both parties are not requesting a settlement conference, a settlement conference will not be set at this time. If the parties determine at a later date that a settlement conference would be fruitful, the parties may contact Courtroom Deputy Esther Valdez at evaldez@caed.uscourts.gov to schedule a settlement conference. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 9/16/2022. (Valdez, E)
September 15, 2022 Filing 33 JOINT STATUS REPORT by Ingrid C. Massey. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
August 31, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 32 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Ana de Alba on 8/31/2022: (Text Only Entry) This matter is set for hearing before District Judge de Alba. The parties are ordered to submit a joint status report, not to exceed five pages, within 10 court days, that addresses the following: What is the procedural history of the case? Is the motion presently before the court still at issue for the parties? Have the parties engaged in settlement negotiations whether formally or informally? If so, when? Would the parties benefit from a mandatory settlement conference before a Magistrate Judge? Would the parties benefit from a status conference with Judge de Alba? The parties are further advised that due to the judicial resource emergency and COVID pandemic, there are more than 130 motions currently under submission in Judge de Alba's recently re-assigned caseload. The Court understands the impact that such a backlog has on the parties and although the Court will continue working diligently to resolve all pending motions, it may still be months before the parties' pending motion is resolved. As such, in light of having the heaviest district court caseload in the nation, limited Court resources, and the need to prioritize criminal and older civil matters over more recently filed actions, this Court strongly encourages the parties to consent to conduct all further proceedings before a U.S. Magistrate Judge. (Hernandez, M)
August 24, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 31 ORDER REASSIGNING CASE by Chief Judge Kimberly J. Mueller: Due to the appointment of *District Judge Ana de Alba* to the bench of the Eastern District of California, this action is reassigned from *District Judge Dale A. Drozd* to District Judge Ana de Alba for all further proceedings. (Zignago, K.)
July 15, 2022 Filing 30 CONSENT/DECLINE of U.S. Magistrate Judge Jurisdiction. Pursuant to Fed. R. Civ. P. 73(b)(1), this document is restricted to attorneys and court staff only. Judges do not have access to view this document and will be informed of a party's response only if all parties have consented to the referral. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
July 15, 2022 Filing 29 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Gurpreet Sandhu on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Sandhu, Gurpreet added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sandhu, Gurpreet)
July 15, 2022 Filing 28 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Lambert, Sarah Marie Carlson added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Lambert, Sarah)
July 15, 2022 Filing 27 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Eric D. Sentlinger on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Sentlinger, Eric D. added. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Sentlinger, Eric)
July 15, 2022 Filing 26 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Spencer Peter Hugret on behalf of FCA US, LLC. (Attachments: #1 Certificate of Service)(Hugret, Spencer)
July 15, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 25 ORDER GRANTING SUBSTITUTION OF ATTORNEY, signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 07/15/2022. Spencer Peter Hugret for FCA US, LLC in place of Attorney Richard L. Stuhlbarg. (Maldonado, C)
July 14, 2022 Filing 24 SUBSTITUTION of ATTORNEY - PROPOSED, submitted by FCA US, LLC. (Stuhlbarg, Richard)
June 22, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 23 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of this case, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for 6/29/2022 is continued to October 27, 2022, at 9:00 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. NOTE: Motion to Remand (Doc. #7 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 6/22/2022. (Valdez, E)
May 10, 2022 Filing 22 DESIGNATION of COUNSEL FOR SERVICE. Added attorney Tionna Dolin for Ingrid C. Massey, attorney Karin Kuemerle terminated (Dolin, Tionna)
April 26, 2022 Filing 21 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Ariel Harman-Holmes on behalf of Ingrid C. Massey. Attorney Harman-Holmes, Ariel added. (Harman-Holmes, Ariel)
March 25, 2022 Filing 20 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Bryan Andrew Reynolds on behalf of FCA US, LLC. Attorney Reynolds, Bryan Andrew added. (Reynolds, Bryan)
March 23, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 19 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the current status of this case, the SCHEDULING CONFERENCE currently set for 3/30/2022 is continued to June 29, 2022, at 9:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference. The parties shall appear at the conference with each party connecting remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. NOTE: Motion to Remand (Doc. #7 ) pending. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 3/23/2022. (Valdez, E)
January 31, 2022 Filing 18 NOTICE of Withdrawal of Counsel by FCA US, LLC. (Jackson, Mikaela)
January 29, 2022 Filing 17 NOTICE of CHANGE of ADDRESS by Tionna Dolin. (Dolin, Tionna)
January 13, 2022 Opinion or Order Filing 16 MINUTE ORDER (TEXT Only): Due to the temporary magistrate judge referral, the Scheduling Conference currently set for March 30, 2022 is HEREBY RESET to March 30, 2022 at 8:30 AM in Courtroom 8 (BAM) before Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe. The parties shall file a Joint Scheduling Report one week prior to the conference in full compliance with the requirements set forth in the Order Setting Mandatory Scheduling Conference (see attached). The parties shall appear at the conference remotely either via Zoom video conference or Zoom telephone number. The parties will be provided with the Zoom ID and password by the Courtroom Deputy prior to the conference. The Zoom ID number and password are confidential and are not to be shared. Appropriate court attire required. Minute order signed by Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe on 1/13/2022. (Valdez, E)
January 6, 2022 Filing 15 NOTICE OF TEMPORARY MAGISTRATE JUDGE REFERRAL: Due to the elevation of Judge Jennifer L. Thurston to the position of U.S. District Judge, this action is temporarily referred to *Magistrate Judge Barbara A. McAuliffe* until such time as a new Bakersfield magistrate judge is appointed. Documents filed in this case shall include the temporary magistrate judge initials *(BAM)* (Sant Agata, S)
December 15, 2021 Filing 14 NOTICE OF WITHDRAWAL OF COUNSEL by All Plaintiffs. Attorney Kuemerle, Karin added. (Kuemerle, Karin)
December 14, 2021 Filing 13 REPLY by Ingrid C. Massey re #7 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Supplement Evidentiary Objection to Jackson Declaration)(Law, Daniel)
December 7, 2021 Filing 12 OPPOSITION by Defendant FCA US LLC to #8 Request for Judicial Notice. (Jackson, Mikaela)
December 7, 2021 Filing 11 OPPOSITION by FCA US LLC to #7 Motion to Remand,. (Attachments: #1 Declaration DECLARATION OF MIKAELA M. JACKSON IN SUPPORT OF FCA US LLC'S OPPOSITION TO PLAINTIFF'S MOTION TO REMAND)(Jackson, Mikaela)
November 29, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 10 MINUTE ORDER, signed by Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston on 11/29/2021: In light of the pending motion to remand, the Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2021 is CONTINUED to 3/30/2022 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. The parties are reminded of their obligation to file a joint scheduling report at least one week prior to the conference. (Text Only Entry) (Hall, S)
November 24, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 9 MINUTE ORDER signed by District Judge Dale A. Drozd on 11/24/2021: (Text Only Entry) The parties are advised that pursuant to General Order No. 617, addressing the public health emergency posed by the coronavirus (COVID-19) outbreak, all civil motions set for hearing before District Judge Dale A. Drozd will be decided on the papers. The parties should not contact Judge Drozd's chambers to inquire about whether a hearing on a pending motion will be held. If the court determines that a hearing is necessary, the court will issue an order to specially set the motion for hearing by telephone or video conference. In accordance with Judge Drozd's Standing Order in Light of Judicial Emergency in the Eastern District of California, the hearing date selected by the movant will continue to govern the deadlines for opposition and reply briefs pursuant to Local Rule 230(c).(Hernandez, M)
November 23, 2021 Filing 8 REQUEST for JUDICIAL NOTICE by Ingrid C. Massey in re #7 Motion to Remand,. (Law, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 7 MOTION to REMAND by Ingrid C. Massey. Motion Hearing set for 12/21/2021 at 09:30 AM in Courtroom 5 (DAD) before District Judge Dale A. Drozd. (Attachments: #1 Memorandum Plaintiff's Memorandum of Points and Authorities in Support of Plaintiff's Motion to Remand, #2 Declaration Declaration of Daniel Law In Support of Remand, #3 Proposed Order Proposed Order Granting Remand)(Law, Daniel)
November 23, 2021 Filing 6 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Daniel Albert Law on behalf of Ingrid C. Massey. Attorney Law, Daniel Albert added. (Law, Daniel)
November 11, 2021 Filing 5 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Jennifer C. Koo on behalf of FCA US LLC. (Koo, Jennifer)
November 9, 2021 Filing 4 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Simi Peterson on behalf of Ingrid C. Massey. Attorney Peterson, Simi added. (Peterson, Simi)
October 8, 2021 Filing 3 NOTICE of APPEARANCE by Mikaela Marie Jackson on behalf of FCA US LLC. Attorney Jackson, Mikaela Marie added. (Jackson, Mikaela)
September 17, 2021 Filing 2 CIVIL NEW CASE DOCUMENTS ISSUED; Initial Scheduling Conference set for 12/15/2021 at 08:30 AM in Bakersfield, 510 19th Street before Magistrate Judge Jennifer L. Thurston. (Attachments: #1 Standing Order, #2 JLT Worksheet, #3 Standing Order re Judicial Emergency, #4 Consent Form, #5 VDRP) (Sant Agata, S)
September 16, 2021 Filing 1 NOTICE of REMOVAL from Kern County Superior Court, case number BCV-21-100345) by Ingrid C. Massey. (Filing fee $ 402, receipt number ACAEDC-9823516) (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet, #2 Declaration of Jennifer C. Koo, #3 Notice of Interested Parties)(Koo, Jennifer)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: Massey v. FCA US LLC, et al
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Ingrid C. Massey
Represented By: Tionna Dolin
Represented By: Simi Peterson
Represented By: Karin Kuemerle
Represented By: Daniel Albert Law
Represented By: Ariel Harman-Holmes
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Jennifer C. Koo
Represented By: Mikaela Marie Jackson
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: CJM Automotive Group, Inc. Doing business as Bakersfield Chrysler Jeep Fiat
Represented By: Richard L. Stuhlbarg
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: FCA US, LLC
Represented By: Richard L. Stuhlbarg
Represented By: Mikaela Marie Jackson
Represented By: Jennifer C. Koo
Represented By: Bryan A. Reynolds
Represented By: Eric D. Sentlinger
Represented By: Gurpreet Sandhu
Represented By: Sarah Marie Carlson Lambert
Represented By: Spencer Peter Hugret
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?