(SS) Nardone v. Commissioner of Social Security
Plaintiff: Georgina Nardone
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Case Number: 1:2021cv01444
Filed: September 28, 2021
Court: US District Court for the Eastern District of California
Presiding Judge: Sheila K Oberto
Nature of Suit: Social Security: SSID Tit. XVI
Cause of Action: 42 U.S.C. ยง 405
Jury Demanded By: None
Docket Report

This docket was last retrieved on November 21, 2022. A more recent docket listing may be available from PACER.

Date Filed Document Text
October 20, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 7 ORDER GRANTING #6 Application for Pro Hac Vice, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 10/19/2021. Added attorney Samuel Fishman, PHV for Georgina Nardone. The Pro Hac Vice attorney is directed to request electronic filing access through PACER. (Martin-Gill, S)
October 18, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 6 PRO HAC VICE APPLICATION and PROPOSED ORDER submitted by Georgina Nardone for attorney Samuel Fishman to appear Pro Hac Vice. (Filing fee $ 225, receipt number ACAEDC-9878556) (Attachments: #1 Exhibit Certificate of Good Standing)(Nyman, Melissa)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 5 ORDER RE CONSENT in SOCIAL SECURITY APPEAL; Consent or Decline due by 1/3/2022. (Attachments: #1 Consent Form) (Marrujo, C)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 4 SUMMONS ISSUED as to *Commissioner of Social Security* with answer to complaint due within *60* days. Attorney *Melissa Markos Nyman* *Attorney at Law* *3009 Douglas Blvd., Suite 200* *Roseville, CA 95661*. (Marrujo, C)
September 30, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 3 ORDER GRANTING #2 Motion to Proceed IFP and STAYING Case, signed by Magistrate Judge Sheila K. Oberto on 9/30/2021. (Marrujo, C)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 2 MOTION to PROCEED IN FORMA PAUPERIS by Georgina Nardone O/B/O I.F. (a minor). (Nyman, Melissa)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order Filing 1 COMPLAINT against Commissioner of Social Security by Georgina Nardone O/B/O I.F. (a minor). Attorney Nyman, Melissa Markos added. (Attachments: #1 Civil Cover Sheet)(Nyman, Melissa)
September 28, 2021 Opinion or Order APPLICATION TO PROCEED IFP filed - Court Action Required. (Marrujo, C)

Access additional case information on PACER

Use the links below to access additional information about this case on the US Court's PACER system. A subscription to PACER is required.

Access this case on the California Eastern District Court's Electronic Court Filings (ECF) System

Search for this case: (SS) Nardone v. Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Plaintiff: Georgina Nardone
Represented By: Melissa Markos Nyman
Represented By: Samuel Fishman, PHV
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]
Defendant: Commissioner of Social Security
Search News [ Google News | Marketwatch | Wall Street Journal | Financial Times | New York Times ]
Search Finance [ Google Finance | Yahoo Finance | Hoovers | SEC Edgar Filings ]
Search Web [ Unicourt | Justia Dockets | Legal Web | Google | Bing | Yahoo | Ask ]

Disclaimer: Justia Dockets & Filings provides public litigation records from the federal appellate and district courts. These filings and docket sheets should not be considered findings of fact or liability, nor do they necessarily reflect the view of Justia.


Why Is My Information Online?